This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2018 at 05:31:25 (UTC).

JIMMIE ABDON SR ET AL VS WHITTIER HILLS HEALTHCARE CENTER ET

Case Summary

On 09/15/2017 JIMMIE ABDON SR filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against WHITTIER HILLS HEALTHCARE CENTER ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6205

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

ARASTU ANWAR MEDICAL DOCTOR

WHITTIER HILLS HEALTHCARE CENTER

DOES 1 TO 100

Minor

ABDON SR. JIMMIE

Guardian Ad Litem

ABDON DOLORES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor Attorney

ORAN MICHAEL L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/19/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

9/15/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

9/15/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

9/19/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

AMENDED - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

9/19/2017: AMENDED - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

10/5/2017: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

COMPLAINT `OR DAMAGES (1) MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; (2) LOSS OF CONSORTIUM.

9/15/2017: COMPLAINT `OR DAMAGES (1) MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; (2) LOSS OF CONSORTIUM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Application-Miscellaneous (AMENDED FOR JIMMIE ABDON,SR. GUARDIAN AD LITEM ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Application-Miscellaneous (FOR JIMMIE ABDON GUARDIAN AD LITEM ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITTIER HILLS HEALTHCARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORAN MICHAEL LAWRENCE