Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 08:28:48 (UTC).

JIMENEZ, JEFFERSON L. VS JIMENEZ, CAROLINE

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 JIMENEZ, JEFFERSON L filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JIMENEZ, CAROLINE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOTSON, KIMBERLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0582

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DOTSON, KIMBERLY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JIMENEZ JEFFERSON L.

Respondent

JIMENEZ CAROLINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHOOK MICHAEL D

Respondent Attorney

KIM CAROLINE S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • Hearing04/21/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department M at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Electronic Service ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department M, Dotson, Kimberly, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Per Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Attorney Fees (Spousal Support ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (In support of Petitioner's Request for orders ); Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (In Support of Her Request for Orders ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketFacsimile Transmission Cover Sheet; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM CAROLINE S