Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 04:25:38 (UTC).

GUERRERO, VICTORIA JIMENEZ VS GUERRERO, JAIME VINCENTE

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 GUERRERO, VICTORIA JIMENEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GUERRERO, JAIME VINCENTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6479

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JIMENEZ GUERRERO VICTORIA

GUERRERO VICTORIA JIMENEZ

Respondent

GUERRERO JAIME VINCENTE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (Approved on 02/06/2018 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less