Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2021 at 04:40:06 (UTC).

CORDOVA, FATIMA DEL ROSARIO JIMENEZ - GUARDIANSHIP

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 CORDOVA, FATIMA DEL ROSARIO JIMENEZ - GUARDIANSHIP was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2634

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CORDOVA FATMIA DEL ROSARIO JIMENEZ

CORDOVA FATIMA DEL ROSARIO JIMENEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ZELADA JESUS

 

Court Documents

Notice - Notice

9/14/2020: Notice - Notice

Notice - Notice

9/14/2020: Notice - Notice

Minute Order

9/18/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/18/2020: Minute Order

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

9/18/2020: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

7/27/2020: PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

Miscellaneous Document - Document of Support of Petition for Special Immigrant Juvenile Notice

8/5/2020: Miscellaneous Document - Document of Support of Petition for Special Immigrant Juvenile Notice

Notice - Hearing

8/5/2020: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

7/16/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/16/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/14/2020: Minute Order

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

3/18/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial)

3/18/2020: Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial)

Declaration - UCCJEA

3/18/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Order - Prescribing Notice

3/18/2020: Order - Prescribing Notice

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Guardian - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Special Immigrant Juvenile Status Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketPetition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketPetition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketProbate Investigations Memo to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketProbate Investigations Memo to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOrder - Prescribing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPetition - Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less