This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2021 at 15:05:53 (UTC).

JIM PARK, ET AL. VS STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 JIM PARK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3456

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PARK JIM

PARK NAN

Defendant

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DER-TATEVOSSIAN VARTAN

Defendant Attorney

BATEZEL MATTHEW FREDERICK

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE ...) OF 10/19/2021

10/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE ...) OF 10/19/2021

Order - Dismissal

10/19/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE ...)

10/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVAL

9/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/28/2021

9/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/28/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL)

7/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL) OF 07/21/2021

7/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL) OF 07/21/2021

Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

6/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Notice - NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1441(B) (DIVERSITY) TO FEDERAL COURT

6/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1441(B) (DIVERSITY) TO FEDERAL COURT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 06/18/2021

6/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 06/18/2021

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/9/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/8/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • Docketat 10:45 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (without prejudice with the Court retaining jurisdiction over any causes of action remanded from federal court) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal without prejudice with the ...) of 10/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal without prejudice with the ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Status Conference (re Removal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docketat 2:17 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/28/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Status of Removal); Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1441(b) (DIVERSITY) TO FEDERAL COURT); Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 06/18/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jim Park (Plaintiff); Nan Park (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jim Park (Plaintiff); Nan Park (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jim Park (Plaintiff); Nan Park (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DER-TATEVOSSIAN VARTAN