This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2023 at 03:33:52 (UTC).

JILA PERRY, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 JILA PERRY, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS, A PUBLIC ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0368

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERRY AN INDIVIDUAL JILA

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

ROBERT LA PEER LLC UNKNOWN ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMERO VANESSA M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

NEBENZAHL MICHAEL R.

 

Court Documents

Informal Discovery Conference

9/13/2023: Informal Discovery Conference

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

9/6/2023: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/13/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/30/2023: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Request for Dismissal

4/19/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/12/2023: Request for Dismissal

Answer

4/7/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/23/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/5/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/5/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/5/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/5/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/5/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/5/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2025
  • Hearing01/02/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2024
  • Hearing07/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2024
  • Hearing06/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2023
  • Hearing09/28/2023 at 11:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference; Filed by: JILA PERRY, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 09/28/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketAddress for VANESSA M. ROMERO, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Vanessa M. Romero, Esq. (Attorney): First Name changed from VANESSA to Vanessa; Last Name changed from ROMERO to Romero

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketAddress for Vanessa M. Romero, Esq. (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/02/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JILA PERRY, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JILA PERRY, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less