This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2021 at 19:12:28 (UTC).

JHPDE FINANCE I LLC VS ASIDA MIRZOYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 JHPDE FINANCE I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ASIDA MIRZOYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5072

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JHPDE FINANCE I LLC

Defendant

MIRZOYAN AN INDIVIDUAL ASIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH CHRISTOPHER D.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Declaration - DECLARATION OF VENUE

7/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF VENUE

Complaint

7/8/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • Hearing10/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JHPDE Finance I LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Venue); Filed by JHPDE Finance I LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JHPDE Finance I LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JHPDE Finance I LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JHPDE Finance I, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mandarich, Christopher D