This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 08:29:54 (UTC).

JHONY MIRANDA VS PASEO COLORADO HOLDINGS LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 JHONY MIRANDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PASEO COLORADO HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0683

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRANDA JHONY AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

SO-CAL BUILDERS ENTERPRISE INC.

PASEO COLORADO HOLDINGS LLC

CALLISONRTKL INC.

CAPREF PASEO LLC

C.W. DRIVER LLC

DORADO DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC.

ENGLEKIRK STRUCTURAL ENGINEERS INC.

HAYWARD & BAKER INC.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

DORADO DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 100

Not Classified By Court

CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUEVARA SHANNON AMBER

Defendant Attorneys

DUONG ROMAIN

MATHIS JAYNEE ROSE

PELAYO JAZMINE

STANLEY JAMES

Not Classified By Court Attorney

CAPALBO CHRISTOPHER J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/20/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/5/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/13/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/13/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request - REQUEST DEFENDANT C.W. DRIVER, LLC'S REQUEST FOR PRIOR PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY

5/28/2021: Request - REQUEST DEFENDANT C.W. DRIVER, LLC'S REQUEST FOR PRIOR PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY

Cross-Complaint

6/15/2021: Cross-Complaint

Notice - NOTICE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF SERVICE ADDRESS

6/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF SERVICE ADDRESS

Demand for Jury Trial

6/15/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

6/15/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

2/18/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/20/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

1/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

1/10/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • Hearing01/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Hearing06/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Hearing06/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Paseo Colorado Holdings LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jhony Miranda, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Unavailability); Filed by C.W. DRIVER, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jhony Miranda, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jhony Miranda, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jhony Miranda, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jhony Miranda, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jhony Miranda, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jhony Miranda, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jhony Miranda, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DORADO DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hayward Baker, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALLISONRTKL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PASEO COLORADO HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant