This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 01:44:35 (UTC).

JHOANNA RAMOS VS GINA FULGENCIO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 JHOANNA RAMOS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GINA FULGENCIO,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1312

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS JHOANNA

Defendants

WOODLAND CARE CENTER LLC

FULGENCIO GINA

GENESIS HEALTHCARE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GEORGE MEGHAN E

FRIEDMAN TODD

Defendant Attorney

DE LEON LARA C.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

7/14/2021: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/14/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

3/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Mail

8/6/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

8/6/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/11/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/8/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

3/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Substitution of Attorney

2/21/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

2/21/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/30/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

1/6/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/6/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

1/7/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jhoanna Ramos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Jhoanna Ramos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Woodland Care Center, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Woodland Care Center, LLC (Defendant); Genesis Healthcare LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jhoanna Ramos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jhoanna Ramos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Woodland Care Center, LLC (Defendant); Genesis Healthcare LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Meghan E George (Attorney); Todd Friedman (Attorney); Jhoanna Ramos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Todd Friedman (Attorney); Meghan E George (Attorney); Jhoanna Ramos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Meghan E George (Attorney); Todd Friedman (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less