This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2017 at 16:47:44 (UTC).

JFG CONSUTANTS LLC ET AL VS LS ASSETS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2017 JFG CONSUTANTS LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LS ASSETS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3387

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JGF CONSULTANTS LLC

DOUVER BRANDON

Defendants and Respondents

LEKRON INC

PEAK FORECLOSURE SERVICE INC

WYOMING INVESTMENTS LLC

LS ASSETS LLC

POST FAMILY TRUST

LONE OAK FUND LLC

FCI LENDER SERVICES INC

POST LAWRENCE

SHERMAN ALAN I

POST SANDRA

WEISS JACK L.

DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

FAIL FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP BY

POMEROY CAPITAL LLC

COLEMAXX ENTERPRISES INC.

FIRST CITY FUNDING

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

7038 LOS TILOS TRUST DLJ MORTGAGE

21 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

5/31/2017: SUMMONS

Unknown

5/31/2017: Unknown

DECLARATORY RELIEF QUIET TITLE EQUITABLE ESTOPPEL INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FILED ON DEMAND

5/31/2017: DECLARATORY RELIEF QUIET TITLE EQUITABLE ESTOPPEL INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FILED ON DEMAND

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/5/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2017
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First City Funding is a litigant

Latest cases where LS ASSETS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LONE OAK FUND LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PEAK FORECLOSURE SERVICES is a litigant