This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 13:45:39 (UTC).

JESUS TELLES VS BROTHERS SECURITY, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 JESUS TELLES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BROTHERS SECURITY, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAREN NELSON and LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3870

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAREN NELSON

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TELLES JESUS

REYES KELVIN

DENNIS TABITHA

Defendant

BROTHERS SECURITY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRAMER DANIEL JONATHAN

SWEENY CHARLES THOMAS

AIWAZIAN EDWIN

GRUPPCHANG DANIELLE LING

TAKVORYAN OVSANNA

KIM SAM K

YANG CHRISTIE

Defendant Attorney

ODLUM JAMES A.

 

Court Documents

Order - AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

1/13/2023: Order - AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO AMEND ODER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

1/13/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO AMEND ODER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SAM KIM IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION TO AMEND ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

1/11/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SAM KIM IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION TO AMEND ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

10/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Order - ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

10/25/2022: Order - ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT)

10/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT)

10/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/17/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Brief - PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

10/3/2022: Brief - PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF OVSANNA TAKVORYAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

10/3/2022: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF OVSANNA TAKVORYAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SAM KIM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

10/3/2022: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SAM KIM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/3/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN (JACK) ONEIL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT

10/3/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN (JACK) ONEIL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT)

8/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/18/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Order - COURT'S PRELIMINARY APPROVAL CHECKLIST

7/11/2022: Order - COURT'S PRELIMINARY APPROVAL CHECKLIST

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT)

7/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KELVIN REYES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

6/17/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KELVIN REYES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • Hearing05/01/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of Settlement scheduled for 03/02/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 05/01/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Order Granting Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement: Status Date changed from 01/13/2023 to 01/13/2023 ; Filed By: Jesus Telles (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Name Extension: blank ; Exact Name: Amended Order Granting Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement ; Result Date: 01/13/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Brothers Security, Inc. (Defendant) to Brothers Security, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation To Amend Oder Granting Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement; Filed by: Jesus Telles (Plaintiff); As to: Brothers Security, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOrder [Proposed] Amended Order Granting Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement; Signed and Filed by: Jesus Telles (Plaintiff); As to: Brothers Security, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration Of Sam Kim In Support Of Stipulation To Amend Order Granting Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement; Filed by: Jesus Telles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement: Filed By: Jesus Telles (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Final Approval of Settlement scheduled for 03/02/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/29/2019, Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 10/16/2019 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service Summons & Complaint; Filed by: Jesus Telles (Plaintiff); As to: Brothers Security, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 69.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jesus Telles (Plaintiff); As to: Brothers Security, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jesus Telles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: Status Date changed from 10/24/2019 to 07/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maren Nelson in Department 17 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less