This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2020 at 20:57:56 (UTC).

JESUS OCAMPO VS ROYAL PRINTEX INC

Case Summary

On 04/03/2018 JESUS OCAMPO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ROYAL PRINTEX INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0509

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

OCAMPO JESUS

Respondents and Defendants

ROYAL PRINTEX INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CHAMI POUYA B. ESQ.

CHAMI POUYA

CHAMI POUYA B.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

OSHER JEREMY J. ESQ.

BARNES ROBERT WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER RULING

8/27/2019: Order - ORDER RULING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC) AND TRIAL SETTING CONFE...)

7/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC) AND TRIAL SETTING CONFE...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO 1 TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S IMMIGRATION STATUS; AND DECLARATION OF SANDRA KHALILI AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT THEREOF

5/31/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO 1 TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S IMMIGRATION STATUS; AND DECLARATION OF SANDRA KHALILI AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRISTAN MULLIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE 4

5/22/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRISTAN MULLIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE 4

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRISTAN MULLIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE 2

5/22/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRISTAN MULLIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE 2

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/23/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Motion to Quash

2/26/2019: Motion to Quash

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/7/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Reply - Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition of Brian Huh and for Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $3,525.00 Against Defendant Royal Printex, Inc.; Declaration of Pouya

12/5/2018: Reply - Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition of Brian Huh and for Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $3,525.00 Against Defendant Royal Printex, Inc.; Declaration of Pouya

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition)

12/12/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/29/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/4/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

9/17/2018: Minute Order -

DEFENDANT ROYAL PRINTEX, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

8/17/2018: DEFENDANT ROYAL PRINTEX, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/18/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/25/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/18/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 49; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For An Order Vacating Dismissal Entered on September 17, 2019 and for an Order Setting a Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Stipulation ReSettlement) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For An Order Vacating Dismiss...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (For An Order Vacating Dismissal Entered on September 17, 2019 and for an Order Setting a Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Stipulation Re: Settlement); Filed by Jesus Ocampo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Jesus Ocampo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketJudgment (Judgment is STRICKEN- title as amended is: "Order on Motion for Attorney Fees"); Filed by Jesus Ocampo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Jesus Ocampo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees ((Reserved)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (CSR: Audrey Lehman/ #12738); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketOrder (RULING); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Jesus Ocampo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jesus Ocampo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jesus Ocampo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROYAL PRINTEX INC.L is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARNES ROBERT W. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OSHER JEREMY JAMES