This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2021 at 20:22:21 (UTC).

JESUS NAVARRO VS GP MERGER SUB, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 JESUS NAVARRO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GP MERGER SUB, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4534

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVARRO JESUS

Defendants

GP MERGER SUB INC. DBA GLASPRO

GLASPRO INC.

NEW GLASPRO INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVI JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

ROSE ROBERT HURWITZ

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

1/15/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

10/19/2020: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

8/28/2020: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - DEFENDANT GP MERGER SUB, INC.'S NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

7/2/2020: Notice - DEFENDANT GP MERGER SUB, INC.'S NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

4/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/3/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Related Case

6/4/2020: Notice of Related Case

Notice - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

6/4/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES)

6/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES) OF 06/23/2020

6/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES) OF 06/23/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/4/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • Hearing05/25/2022 at 11:00 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Report; Filed by Jesus Navarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement; Filed by Jesus Navarro (Plaintiff); GP Merger Sub, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Trailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketStatus Conference Statement ((Joint)); Filed by Jesus Navarro (Plaintiff); GP Merger Sub, Inc. (Defendant); New Glaspro, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docketat 2:54 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/09/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jesus Navarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jesus Navarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jesus Navarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jesus Navarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jesus Navarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GP MERGER SUB INC. DBA GLASPRO is a litigant

Latest cases where GLASPRO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAVI JOSEPH ESQ.