This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 06:22:48 (UTC).

JESUS MONJARAZ VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/23/2018 JESUS MONJARAZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG, THOMAS D. LONG and CHARLES C. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1382

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

CHARLES C. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MONJARAZ JESUS

SANDOVAL ROSA MARIA

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

DOES 1 TO 50

MARTINEZ JOSE

DISTINCT AUTOMOTIVE SALES

ROSAS ADRIAN

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

ROMERO NORMA

ORDAZ WENDY

ROMERO ROBERTO

MOTHER OF SORROWS CATHOLIC CHURCH AKA ROE 3

DISTINCT AUTOMOTIVE SALES DOE 7

ROBERT ROMERO ROE1

NORMA ROMERO ROE2

JOHNSON RAYVON LEE

Guardian Ad Litems and Not Classified By Court

MONJARAZ HECTOR DANIEL

SANDOVAL ROSA MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ALDER C. MICHAEL ESQ.

ALDER MICHAEL

ALDER C MICHAEL ESQ.

OSTERTAG JENNIFER

Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

OSTERTAG JENNIFER

GRACE MATTHEW B. DEPUTY ATTORNEY

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

MASSERMAN TERRI L. ESQ.

MASSERMAN TERRI LYNN ESQ.

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GRACE MATTHEW B. DEPUTY ATTORNEY

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

MASSERMAN TERRI L. ESQ.

MASSERMAN TERRI LYNN ESQ.

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MASSERMAN TERRI L. ESQ.

MASSERMAN TERRI LYNN ESQ.

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorney

ALDER C MICHAEL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) /ORDER OF DEPO...)

7/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) /ORDER OF DEPO...)

Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

7/9/2021: Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

4/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

3/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

Notice of Ruling

12/7/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT))

3/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT))

Request for Dismissal

10/17/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION

7/5/2019: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/22/2019: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CAPTAIN II JENNIFER THOMAS ISO MSJ OF DF CITY OF LOS ANGELES

3/29/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CAPTAIN II JENNIFER THOMAS ISO MSJ OF DF CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRUC NGUYEN ISO MSJ OF DF CITY OF LOS ANGELES

3/29/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRUC NGUYEN ISO MSJ OF DF CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Separate Statement

3/29/2019: Separate Statement

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) -

10/12/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) -

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONFUL DEATH)

9/18/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONFUL DEATH)

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

8/29/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/25/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

5/21/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • Hearing08/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Charles C. Lee, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (/Order of Deposit to Blocked Account) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) /Order of Depo...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Jesus Monjaraz (Plaintiff); Rosa Maria Sandoval (Plaintiff); Hector Daniel Monjaraz (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Jesus Monjaraz (Plaintiff); Jesus Monjaraz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Order to Show Cause re Proof of Deposit); Filed by Jesus Monjaraz (Plaintiff); Rosa Maria Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Charles C. Lee, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Jesus Monjaraz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
158 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jesus Monjaraz (Plaintiff); Rosa Maria Sandoval (Plaintiff); Hector Daniel Monjaraz (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jesus Monjaraz (Plaintiff); Rosa Maria Sandoval (Plaintiff); Hector Daniel Monjaraz (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jesus Monjaraz (Plaintiff); Rosa Maria Sandoval (Plaintiff); Hector Daniel Monjaraz (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jesus Monjaraz (Plaintiff); Rosa Maria Sandoval (Plaintiff); Hector Daniel Monjaraz (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENC/NEGLIGENT PURSUIT BY PUBFLC AGENCY ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jesus Monjaraz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691382    Hearing Date: April 6, 2021    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JESUS MONJARAZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC691382

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

April 6, 2021

 

This matter was previously heard on 3/22/21, where although Petitioner appeared, there were no appearances by counsel for Petitioner. Consequently, the court continued the hearing to 4/6/21, and ordered counsel for Petitioner to appear along with Petitioner. Counsel is reminded that if counsel that does not appear, counsel may be in violation of a court order. (Min. Order 3/22/21.)

Plaintiffs, Jesus Monjaraz (“Claimant”) by and through her guardian ad litem, Hector Daniel Monjaraz (“Petitioner”), Rosa Maria Sandoval (“Sandoval”) filed this action against Defendant City of Los Angeles, et al. for injuries Claimant sustained when Los Angeles Police Department Officers were pursuing a different individual. The complaint alleges the LAPD officers were negligent in their pursuit of an individual, which caused a vehicle to collide with Claimant. The complaint included a loss of consortium claim by Plaintiff Sandoval, who is Claimant’s wife. Claimant suffered multiple complex facial, orbital and cranial fractures and trauma, including a skull fracture, intracranial hemorrhages, and traumatic brain damage, multiple orthopedic fractures including rib fractures, right wrist fracture, left leg/femur fracture and sacral fracture. Claimant has not recovered completely and suffers from permanent injuries.

Plaintiffs have agreed to settle all claims with Defendants for the total amount of $165,000.00, with $22,500 being apportioned to Claimant and $142,500 apportioned to Sandoval. Pertaining to Claimant, if the settlement is approved, $7,500 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $4,778.20 will be used for costs. The net balance of $10,221.80 will be deposited into a blocked account.

This is Petitioner’s second amended petition. The court has reviewed the settlement and finds it fair and reasonable. Furthermore, the court has reviewed Counsel’s declaration and is satisfied sufficient efforts were expended to justify the 33.33% attorney’s fees request.

Pursuant to CRC 7.952, Claimant and Petitioner must appear at the hearing on this matter unless the court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The court find’s Claimant’s condition constitutes good cause to excuse his appearance. The court will require Petitioner to appear at the hearing. If the court is satisfied with Petitioner’s testimony at the hearing, the petition will be granted, and the court will sign the proposed order to approve the settlement. The court encourages Petitioner to appear remotely.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.orgIf the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 6th day of April, 2021

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC691382    Hearing Date: March 22, 2021    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JESUS MONJARAZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC691382

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

March 22, 2021

 

Plaintiffs, Jesus Monjaraz (“Claimant”) by and through his guardian ad litem, Hector Daniel Monjaraz (“Petitioner”), Rosa Maria Sandoval (“Sandoval”) filed this action against Defendant City of Los Angeles, et al. for injuries Claimant sustained when Los Angeles Police Department Officers were pursuing a different individual. The complaint alleges the LAPD officers were negligent in their pursuit of an individual, which caused a vehicle to collide with Claimant. The complaint included a loss of consortium claim by Plaintiff Sandoval, who is Claimant’s wife. Claimant suffered multiple complex facial, orbital and cranial fractures and trauma, including a skull fracture, intracranial hemorrhages, and traumatic brain damage, multiple orthopedic fractures including rib fractures, right wrist fracture, left leg/femur fracture and sacral fracture. Claimant has not recovered completely and suffers from permanent injuries.

Plaintiffs have agreed to settle all claims with Defendants for the total amount of $165,000.00, with $22,500 being apportioned to Claimant and $142,500 apportioned to Sandoval. Pertaining to Claimant, if the settlement is approved, $7,500 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $4,778.20 will be used for costs. The net balance of $10,221.80 will be deposited into a blocked account.

This is Petitioner’s second amended petition. The court has reviewed the settlement and finds it fair and reasonable. Furthermore, the court has reviewed Counsel’s declaration and is satisfied sufficient efforts were expended to justify the 33.33% attorney’s fees request.

Pursuant to CRC 7.952, Claimant and Petitioner must appear at the hearing on this matter unless the court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The court find’s Claimant’s condition constitutes good cause to excuse his appearance. The court will require Petitioner to appear at the hearing. If the court is satisfied with Petitioner’s testimony at the hearing, the petition will be granted, and the court will sign the proposed order to approve the settlement. The court encourages Petitioner to appear remotely.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 22nd day of March, 2021

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC691382    Hearing Date: December 04, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JESUS MONJARAZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC691382

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

December 4, 2020

 

Plaintiffs, Jesus Monjaraz (“Claimant”) by and through her guardian ad litem, Hector Daniel Monjaraz (“Petitioner”), Rosa Maria Sandoval (“Sandoval”) filed this action against Defendant City of Los Angeles, et al. for injuries Claimant sustained when Los Angeles Police Department Officers were pursuing a different individual. The complaint alleges the LAPD officers were negligent in their pursuit of an individual, which caused a vehicle to collide with Claimant. The complaint included a loss of consortium claim by Plaintiff Sandoval, who is Claimant’s wife. Claimant suffered multiple complex facial, orbital and cranial fractures and trauma, including a skull fracture, intracranial hemorrhages, and traumatic brain damage, multiple orthopedic fractures including rib fractures, right wrist fracture, left leg/femur fracture and sacral fracture. Claimant has not recovered completely and suffers from permanent injuries.

Plaintiffs have agreed to settle all claims with Defendants for the total amount of $165,000.00, with $22,500 being apportioned to Claimant and $142,500 apportioned to Sandoval. Pertaining to Claimant, if the settlement is approved, $9,000 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $4,778.20 will be used for costs. The net balance of $8,721.80 will be deposited into a blocked account.

The petition is denied without prejudice for the following reasons:

Pursuant to CRC 7.952, Claimant and Petitioner must appear at the hearing on this matter unless the court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The court find’s Claimant’s condition constitutes good cause to excuse his appearance. The court will require Petitioner to appear at the hearing. Petitioner may appear at this hearing, or at a hearing on an amended petition, at Petitioner’s preference.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 4th day of December, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALDER C MICHAEL