This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2019 at 01:23:05 (UTC).

JESUS MEZA JIMENEZ ET AL VS LA COUNTY METRO TRANS AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by JESUS MEZA JIMENEZ against LA COUNTY METRO TRANS AUTHORITY in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4543

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

VALENZUELA CONCEPCION

VALENZUELA JAYLEN MEZA

Respondents and Defendants

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORT

DOES 1 TO 50

BORJA FLORENCIO BOB

Minors

VALENZUELA JESUS EDUARDO MEZA

VALENZUELA JULIAN MEZA

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL - EX PARTE

3/9/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL - EX PARTE

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL - EX PARTE

3/28/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL - EX PARTE

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL - EX PARTE

3/28/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL - EX PARTE

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

3/28/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

4/18/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/20/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transport (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transport (Defendant); Florencio Bob Borja (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transport (Defendant); Florencio Bob Borja (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (DEMURRER; Demurrer overruled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-11 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL - EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL - EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL - EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Concepcion Valenzuela (Plaintiff); Jaylen Meza Valenzuela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694543    Hearing Date: March 20, 2020    Dept: 29

Jimenez et al. v. LA County Metro Trans Authority

The hearing on the three Motions to be Relieved as Counsel is CONTINUED to 5/7/2020 at 1:30 p.m.

Based on current conditions, including, but not limited to, the spread of COVID-19, the need for social distancing, and a state of emergency having been declared by Governor Newsom, the court finds good cause for the continuance.

Moving party is ordered to give notice