This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 08:41:19 (UTC).

JESUS MEDINA, ET AL. VS JAMESON KANE SEARER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 JESUS MEDINA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAMESON KANE SEARER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9800

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEDINA JESUS

MEDINA ELIZABETH

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SEARER JAMESON KANE

KHATCHATOURIAN DAVID

Defendant and Cross Defendant

KHATCHATOURIAN DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAZEROUNI MASIH

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FITZHUGH TIMOTHY

Cross Defendant Attorney

RUGH CAROL R.

 

Court Documents

Answer

9/30/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/30/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

9/30/2021: Answer

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

6/9/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JANICE

6/9/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JANICE

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JOSHUA

6/10/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JOSHUA

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/10/2021: PI General Order

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM JANICE

6/14/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM JANICE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Cross-Complaint

7/26/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

7/26/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/26/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2024
  • Hearing05/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Hearing11/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • Hearing11/09/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by David Khatchatourian (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by David Khatchatourian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by David Khatchatourian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jameson Kane Searer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Jameson Kane Searer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Jameson Kane Searer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jameson Kane Searer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Joshua); Filed by Joshua Medina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Janice); Filed by Jesus Medina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jesus Medina (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Medina (Plaintiff); Joshua Medina (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Jesus Medina (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Medina (Plaintiff); Joshua Medina (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Jesus Medina (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Medina (Plaintiff); Joshua Medina (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jesus Medina (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Medina (Plaintiff); Joshua Medina (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jesus Medina (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Medina (Plaintiff); Joshua Medina (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUGH CAROL R.