This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/16/2023 at 17:54:50 (UTC).

JESUS MARTIN MARTINEZ SALDANA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS RODRIGUEZ SR TRUCKING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 JESUS MARTIN MARTINEZ SALDANA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ SR TRUCKING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4917

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ SALDANA AN INDIVIDUAL JESUS MARTIN

Defendants

J CORDERO TRUCKING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MORAN AN INDIVIDUAL JONATHAN ALEXANDER

RODRIGUEZ SR TRUCKING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEDRISH LAURA F.

Defendant Attorney

CULLINS DOUGLAS DRAKE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

3/9/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED TO...)

3/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED TO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED TO...) OF 03/03/2023

3/3/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED TO...) OF 03/03/2023

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO COMPEL

2/23/2023: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO COMPEL

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES SET 1

2/16/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES SET 1

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET 1

2/16/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET 1

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SET 1

2/16/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SET 1

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM AS ADMITTED REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET 1 BY DEFENDANT

2/16/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM AS ADMITTED REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET 1 BY DEFENDANT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ SR TRUCKING,...)

2/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ SR TRUCKING,...)

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

2/8/2023: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM AS ADMITTED REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE, BY RODRIGUEZ SR. TRUCKING, INC.

2/3/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM AS ADMITTED REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE, BY RODRIGUEZ SR. TRUCKING, INC.

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ SR. TRUCKING, INC. TO RESPOND TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

2/3/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ SR. TRUCKING, INC. TO RESPOND TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ SR. TRUCKING, INC. TO RESPOND TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

2/3/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ SR. TRUCKING, INC. TO RESPOND TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ SR. TRUCKING, INC. TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

2/3/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ SR. TRUCKING, INC. TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/29/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS (SET ONE) DEEMED ADMITTED BY DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ SR TRUCKIN

11/23/2022: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS (SET ONE) DEEMED ADMITTED BY DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ SR TRUCKIN

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ SR TRUCKING, INC. TO RESPOND TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND TO AWARD SANCTIONS IN THE AMO

11/23/2022: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ SR TRUCKING, INC. TO RESPOND TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND TO AWARD SANCTIONS IN THE AMO

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT JONATHAN ALEXANDER MORAN TO RESPOND TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND TO AWARD SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT

11/23/2022: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT JONATHAN ALEXANDER MORAN TO RESPOND TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND TO AWARD SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2025
  • Hearing02/05/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • Hearing08/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • Hearing07/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: JESUS MARTIN MARTINEZ SALDANA, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS (SET ONE) DEEMED ADMITTED BY DEFENDANT JONATHAN ALEXANDER MORAN AND TO AWARD SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $811.65: Filed By: JESUS MARTIN MARTINEZ SALDANA, an Individual (Plaintiff); Result: Granted in Part ; Result Date: 03/03/2023 ; As To Parties changed from JONATHAN ALEXANDER MORAN, an Individual (Defendant) to JONATHAN ALEXANDER MORAN, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT JONATHAN ALEXANDER MORAN TO RESPOND TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND TO AWARD SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $811.65: Filed By: JESUS MARTIN MARTINEZ SALDANA, an Individual (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/03/2023 ; As To Parties changed from JONATHAN ALEXANDER MORAN, an Individual (Defendant) to JONATHAN ALEXANDER MORAN, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Plaintiff's Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted to...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Plaintiff's Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted to...) of 03/03/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted to Deem Requests for Admission sent to Defendant Jonathan Moran Admitted scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 updated: Result Date to 03/03/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Defendant Jonathan Moran's Responses to Request for Production, Set One scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 updated: Result Date to 03/03/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/05/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: JESUS MARTIN MARTINEZ SALDANA, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: RODRIGUEZ SR TRUCKING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); J CORDERO TRUCKING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); JONATHAN ALEXANDER MORAN, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JESUS MARTIN MARTINEZ SALDANA, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: RODRIGUEZ SR TRUCKING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); J CORDERO TRUCKING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); JONATHAN ALEXANDER MORAN, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JESUS MARTIN MARTINEZ SALDANA, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: RODRIGUEZ SR TRUCKING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); J CORDERO TRUCKING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); JONATHAN ALEXANDER MORAN, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******4917 Hearing Date: March 3, 2023 Dept: 28

Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana’s Motion to Deem Jonathan Alexander Moran’s Request for Admissions Admitted; Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana’s Motion to Compel Jonathan Alexander Moran’s Responses to Special Interrogatories

Having considered the moving, opposing, and reply papers, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On February 9, 2022, Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendants Rodriguez Sr. Trucking, Inc. (“Rodriguez”), J Cordero Trucking, Inc. (“Cordero”) and Jonathan Alexander Moran (“Moran”) for negligence.

On May 2, 2022, Rodriguez and Moran filed an answer.

On November 23, 2022, Plaintiff filed Motions to Compel Responses to Special Interrgatories and Deem Request for Admissions Admitted, set to be heard on March 3, 2023. On February 16, 2023, Rodriguez and Moran (“Opposing Defendants”) filed an opposition. On February 23, 2023, Plaintiff filed a reply.

Trial is currently scheduled for August 9, 2023.

PARTY’S REQUESTS

Plaintiff requests the Court compel Moran to serve full and complete verified responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and deem Request for Admissions Admitted, Set One. Plaintiff also requests $811.65 in sanctions for each motion.

Opposing Defendants requests the Court deny the motions.

LEGAL STANDARD

Under California Code of Civil Procedure 2031.300, “If a party to whom a demand for inspection, copying, testing, or sampling is directed fails to serve a timely response to it, the following rules shall apply: (b) The party making the demand may move for an order compelling response to the demand.” According to CCP 2030.260, for a response to interrogatories to be timely, it must be served within 30 days of service. CCP 2031.260 provides the same 30-day deadline for request for production responses.

CCP 2023.030(a) provides that “[t]he court may impose a monetary sanction ordering that one engaging in the misuse of the discovery process, or any attorney advising that conduct, or both pay the reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, incurred by anyone as a result of that conduct.” According to CCP 2023.010(d), misuse of the discovery process includes “failing to respond or to submit to an authorized method of discovery.”

CCP 2030.290(c) states that “the court shall impose a monetary sanction under Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 2023.010) against any party, person, or attorney who unsuccessfully makes or opposes a motion to compel a response to interrogatories, unless it finds that the one subject to the sanction acted with substantial justification or that other circumstances make the imposition of the sanction unjust.”

CCP 2033.220 provides the following: “(a) Each answer in a response to requests for admission shall be as complete and straightforward as the information reasonably available to the responding party permits. (b) Each answer shall: (1) Admit so much of the matter involved in the request as is true, either as expressed in the request itself or as reasonably and clearly qualified by the responding party. (2) Deny so much of the matter involved in the request as is untrue. (3) Specify so much of the matter involved in the request as to the truth of which the responding party lacks sufficient information or knowledge.(c) If a responding party gives lack of information or knowledge as a reason for a failure to admit all or part of a request for admission, that party shall state in the answer that a reasonable inquiry concerning the matter in the particular request has been made, and that the information known or readily obtainable is insufficient to enable that party to admit the matter.”

Under CCP 2033.280, a party who fails to serve timely responses to requests for admissions waives any objections to the requests, including those based on privilege. Upon failure to serve a timely response, a requesting party can move for a court order that the truth of the matter specified in the requests be deemed admitted. CCP 2033.280(c) states “The court shall make this order, unless it finds that the party to whom the requests for admission have been directed has served, before the hearing on the motion, a proposed response to the requests for admission that is in substantial compliance with Section 2033.220. It is mandatory that the court impose a monetary sanction under Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 2023.010) on the party or attorney, or both, whose failure to serve a timely response to requests for admission necessitated this motion.”

DISCUSSION

No Moving Papers

The Court notes that there are two additional motions on calendar regarding Form Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. However, the moving papers for these motions were never filed with the Court. The Court thus will not issue a ruling on either form of discovery.

Discovery

Plaintiff served discovery on Moran on May 4, 2022; responses were due on July 19, 2022. Moran served unverified responses; unverified responses are equivalent to no response at all.

Moran’s counsel first notes they have been unable to contact Moran to provide verifications and made Plaintiff aware of this fact. However, the Plaintiff is still entitled to timely discovery responses; Moran’s failure to provide timely verifications is still considered to be misuse of the discovery process, and subject to sanctions.

Moran also argues that a motion to compel is not the proper means to bring forward this motion—rather these motions should have been motions to compel further, as Moran served objection only responses. While it is true that a response consisting of only objections does not require verification, Moran’s special interrogatory responses do not only consist of objections. The response to the Special Interrogatories contains multiple answers with no objections. The Request for Admissions is wholly comprised of objections, which do not require verifications under CCP 2033.240. A motion to compel further is required to grant relief regarding admissions. The Court grants the motion only as to the interrogatories and requests for production.

Sanctions

Plaintiff is entitled to reasonable sanctions due to Defendants’ misuse of the discovery process in failing to provide verifications. The Court will only grant sanctions for the three granted motions.

Plaintiff seeks sanctions of $811.65 for each of motion, based on 3 hours of attorney’s time at a rate of $250.00 per hour and one $61.65 filling fee. 1.5 hours were spent drafting the motion and 1.5 hours attending the hearing. The Court accounts for the fact that the motions are substantially similar and will be heard concurrently. The Court awards sanctions of $684.94 (2 hrs. x $250 + 3 x $61.50).

CONCLUSION

Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana’s Motion to Deem Jonathan Alexander Moran’s Request for Admissions Admitted is DENIED.

Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana’s Motion to Compel Jonathan Alexander Moran’s Responses to Special Interrogatories is GRANTED. Rodriguez is ordered to provide verified, code-compliant responses within 30 days of the hearing on the motion.

Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana’s Motion to Compel Jonathan Alexander Moran’s Responses to Form Interrogatories is GRANTED. Rodriguez is ordered to provide verified, code-compliant responses within 30 days of the hearing on the motion.

Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana’s Motion to Compel Jonathan Alexander Moran’s Responses to Requests for Production is GRANTED. Rodriguez is ordered to provide verified, code-compliant responses within 30 days of the hearing on the motion.

Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana’s Requests for Sanctions is GRANTED. Moran is ordered to pay Plaintiff $684.94 in sanctions within 30 days of the hearing on the motion.

Moving party is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Moving Party is ordered to file the proof of service of this ruling with the Court within five days.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.



Case Number: *******4917 Hearing Date: February 16, 2023 Dept: 28

Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana’s Motion to Deem Defendant Rodriguez Sr. Trucking, Inc.’s Request for Admissions Admitted; Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana’s Motion to Compel Defendant Rodriguez Sr. Trucking, Inc.’s Responses to Request for Production of Documents; Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana’s Motion to Compel Defendant Rodriguez Sr. Trucking, Inc.’s Responses to Form Interrogatories; Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana’s Motion to Compel Defendant Rodriguez Sr. Trucking, Inc.’s Responses to Special Interrogatories

Having considered the moving, opposing, and reply papers, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On February 9, 2022, Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendants Rodriguez Sr. Trucking, Inc. (“Rodriguez”), J Cordero Trucking, Inc. (“Cordero”) and Jonathan Alexander Moran (“Moran”) for negligence.

On May 2, 2022, Rodriguez and Moran filed an answer.

On October 31, 2022, Plaintiff filed Motions to Compel Discovery Responses and Deem Request for Admissions Admitted, set to be heard on February 16, 2023. On February 3, 2023, Rodriguez filed an opposition. On February 8, 2023, Plaintiff filed a reply.

Trial is currently scheduled for August 9, 2023.

PARTY’S REQUESTS

Plaintiff requests the Court compel Rodriguez to serve full and complete verified responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One, Special Interrogatories, Set One, Request for Production of Documents, Set One, and Deem Request for Admissions Admitted, Set One. Plaintiff also requests $811.65 in sanctions for each motion, except for the Request for Production, to which Plaintiff requests $1,061.65.

Rodriguez requests the Court deny the motion.

LEGAL STANDARD

Under California Code of Civil Procedure 2031.300, “If a party to whom a demand for inspection, copying, testing, or sampling is directed fails to serve a timely response to it, the following rules shall apply: (b) The party making the demand may move for an order compelling response to the demand.” According to CCP 2030.260, for a response to interrogatories to be timely, it must be served within 30 days of service. CCP 2031.260 provides the same 30-day deadline for request for production responses.

CCP 2023.030(a) provides that “[t]he court may impose a monetary sanction ordering that one engaging in the misuse of the discovery process, or any attorney advising that conduct, or both pay the reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, incurred by anyone as a result of that conduct.” According to CCP 2023.010(d), misuse of the discovery process includes “failing to respond or to submit to an authorized method of discovery.”

CCP 2030.290(c) states that “the court shall impose a monetary sanction under Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 2023.010) against any party, person, or attorney who unsuccessfully makes or opposes a motion to compel a response to interrogatories, unless it finds that the one subject to the sanction acted with substantial justification or that other circumstances make the imposition of the sanction unjust.”

CCP 2033.220 provides the following: “(a) Each answer in a response to requests for admission shall be as complete and straightforward as the information reasonably available to the responding party permits. (b) Each answer shall: (1) Admit so much of the matter involved in the request as is true, either as expressed in the request itself or as reasonably and clearly qualified by the responding party. (2) Deny so much of the matter involved in the request as is untrue. (3) Specify so much of the matter involved in the request as to the truth of which the responding party lacks sufficient information or knowledge.(c) If a responding party gives lack of information or knowledge as a reason for a failure to admit all or part of a request for admission, that party shall state in the answer that a reasonable inquiry concerning the matter in the particular request has been made, and that the information known or readily obtainable is insufficient to enable that party to admit the matter.”

Under CCP 2033.280, a party who fails to serve timely responses to requests for admissions waives any objections to the requests, including those based on privilege. Upon failure to serve a timely response, a requesting party can move for a court order that the truth of the matter specified in the requests be deemed admitted. CCP 2033.280(c) states “The court shall make this order, unless it finds that the party to whom the requests for admission have been directed has served, before the hearing on the motion, a proposed response to the requests for admission that is in substantial compliance with Section 2033.220. It is mandatory that the court impose a monetary sanction under Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 2023.010) on the party or attorney, or both, whose failure to serve a timely response to requests for admission necessitated this motion.”

DISCUSSION

Discovery

Plaintiff served discovery on both Rodriguez on May 4, 2022; responses were due on July 19, 2022. Rodriguez served unverified responses; unverified responses are equivalent to no response at all.

Rodriguez’s counsel first notes they have been unable to contact Rodriguez to provide verifications and made Plaintiff aware of this fact. However, the Plaintiff is still entitled to timely discovery responses; Rodriguez’s failure to provide timely verifications is still considered to be misuse of the discovery process, and subject to sanctions.

Rodriguez also argues that a motion to compel is not the proper means to bring forward this motion—rather these motions should have been motions to compel further, as Rodriguez served objection only responses. While it is true that a response consisting of only objections does not require verification, Rodriguez’s responses do not only consist of objections. The responses to the Request for Production, Form Interrogatories and Special Interrogatories all contain multiple answers with no objections. The Request for Admissions is wholly comprised of objections, which do not require verifications under CCP 2033.240. A motion to compel further is required to grant relief regarding admissions. Otherwise, the Court grants the motion.

Sanctions

Plaintiff is entitled to reasonable sanctions due to Defendants’ misuse of the discovery process in failing to provide verifications. The Court will only grant sanctions for the three granted motions.

Plaintiff seeks sanctions of $811.65 for each of motion, based on 3 hours of attorney’s time at a rate of $250.00 per hour and one $61.65 filling fee. 1.5 hours were spent drafting the motion and 1.5 hours attending the hearing. Plaintiff also requests an additional $250.00 sanction pursuant to CCP 2023.050 for the ongoing failure to respond to discovery. The Court accounts for the fact that the motions are substantially similar and will be heard concurrently. The Court awards sanctions of $1,434.95 across all motions.

CONCLUSION

Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana’s Motion to Deem Defendant Rodriguez Sr. Trucking, Inc.’s Request for Admissions Admitted is DENIED.

Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana’s Motion to Compel Defendant Rodriguez Sr. Trucking, Inc.’s Responses to Request for Production of Documents is GRANTED. Rodriguez is ordered to provide verified, code-compliant responses within 30 days of the hearing on the motion.

Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana’s Motion to Compel Defendant Rodriguez Sr. Trucking, Inc.’s Responses to Form Interrogatories is GRANTED. Rodriguez is ordered to provide verified, code-compliant responses within 30 days of the hearing on the motion.

Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana’s Motion to Compel Defendant Rodriguez Sr. Trucking, Inc.’s Responses to Special Interrogatories is GRANTED. Rodriguez is ordered to provide verified, code-compliant responses within 30 days of the hearing on the motion.

Plaintiff Jesus Martin Martinez Saldana’s Request for Sanctions is GRANTED. Rodriguez is ordered to pay Plaintiff $1,434.95 in sanctions within 30 days of the hearing on the motion.

Moving party is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Moving Party is ordered to file the proof of service of this ruling with the Court within five days.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.