Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2021 at 05:22:40 (UTC).

JESUS LOPEZ VS TOCAYA MANAGEMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 JESUS LOPEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TOCAYA MANAGEMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7610

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ JESUS

Defendant

TOCAYA MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAMI POUYA B. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

CHAMI POUYA

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

4/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

4/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

4/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

4/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/11/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • Hearing06/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jesus Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jesus Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jesus Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jesus Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jesus Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jesus Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jesus Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOCAYA MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAMI POUYA