This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2021 at 19:41:19 (UTC).

JESUS LOPEZ, ET AL. VS ECOLOGY AUTO PARTS INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 JESUS LOPEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ECOLOGY AUTO PARTS INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM, ELIHU M. BERLE and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3780

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

ELIHU M. BERLE

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ JESUS

Defendant

ECOLOGY AUTO PARTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAWKINS JAMES ROSS

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 07/27/2021

7/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 07/27/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

7/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 08/02/2021, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE NOTICE - FIRST AM

8/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 08/02/2021, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE NOTICE - FIRST AM

Initial Status Conference Order

8/4/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

8/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/04/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

8/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/04/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/28/2021: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • Hearing09/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docketat 3:10 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Initial Status Conference) of 08/04/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 08/02/2021, Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Notice - First Amended General Order in Re LASC Mandatory Electronic Filing for Civil - Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipul...); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docketat 10:20 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination) of 07/27/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jesus Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jesus Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ECOLOGY AUTO PARTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAWKINS JAMES ROSS