This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2023 at 09:39:53 (UTC).

JESUS CUEVAS VS BERGELECTRIC, CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 JESUS CUEVAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BERGELECTRIC, CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1272

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUEVAS JESUS

Defendant

BERGELECTRIC CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANITZ ERIC A.

Defendant Attorney

BOUAYAD ADAM

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

1/23/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-SETTLEMENT STATUS CONFERENCE [RESOLVE LA]; TRIAL SETTING...)

1/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-SETTLEMENT STATUS CONFERENCE [RESOLVE LA]; TRIAL SETTING...)

Request for Dismissal

1/17/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

1/5/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF JESUS CUEVAS REPLY TO DEFENDANT BERGELECTRIC CORPS INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM

1/3/2023: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF JESUS CUEVAS REPLY TO DEFENDANT BERGELECTRIC CORPS INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM

Informal Discovery Conference

1/3/2023: Informal Discovery Conference

Declaration - DECLARATION OF A N BOUAYAD IN SUPPORT OF IDC MEMORANDUM

1/3/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF A N BOUAYAD IN SUPPORT OF IDC MEMORANDUM

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

9/26/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 09/21/2022

9/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 09/21/2022

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/29/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

6/21/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/23/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

6/23/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/7/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

5/13/2022: Answer

Complaint

4/4/2022: Complaint

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2024
  • Hearing02/02/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Jury Trial; Filed by: Jesus Cuevas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (6 Day Estimate) scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/02/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Post-Settlement Status Conference [Resolve LA]; Trial Setting...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketPost-Settlement Status Conference [Resolve LA] scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 updated: Result Date to 01/19/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 updated: Result Date to 01/19/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jesus Cuevas on 04/04/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Jesus Cuevas, causes first cause of action for CFRA Interconference only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jesus Cuevas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Bergelectric, Corp. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from BergElectric, Corp., a California corporation to Bergelectric, Corp.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketAddress for Eric A. Panitz (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jesus Cuevas (Plaintiff); As to: BergElectric, Corp., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jesus Cuevas (Plaintiff); As to: BergElectric, Corp., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jesus Cuevas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jesus Cuevas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less