This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2023 at 00:54:53 (UTC).

JESUS ANGEL RAMIREZ VS WESTPARK CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 JESUS ANGEL RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WESTPARK CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2193

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ JESUS ANGEL

Defendant

WESTPARK CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWANSON BENJAMIN

Defendant Attorney

JONES MATTHEW S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • Hearing04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Westpark Condominium Homeowners Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Westpark Condominium Homeowners Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Westpark Condominium Homeowners Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jesus Angel Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Westpark Condominium Homeowners Association (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/14/2022; Service Cost: 142.28; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Huey P. Cotton in Department A Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jesus Angel Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Westpark Condominium Homeowners Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jesus Angel Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Westpark Condominium Homeowners Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jesus Angel Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Westpark Condominium Homeowners Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less