This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2023 at 02:42:37 (UTC).

JESUS ALFONSO FLORES VS SERGIO BARAJAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 JESUS ALFONSO FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SERGIO BARAJAS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0279

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES JESUS ALFONSO

Defendants

BARAJAS FAMILY SERVICES INC.

BARAJAS JAVIER

BARAJAS SERGIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VARDANYAN GEVORG S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jesus Alfonso Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Javier Barajas (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/09/2023; Service Cost: 134.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jesus Alfonso Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Sergio Barajas (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/09/2023; Service Cost: 134.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jesus Alfonso Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Barajas Family Services, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/07/2023; Service Cost: 134.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jesus Alfonso Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Sergio Barajas (Defendant); Javier Barajas (Defendant); Barajas Family Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jesus Alfonso Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Sergio Barajas (Defendant); Javier Barajas (Defendant); Barajas Family Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jesus Alfonso Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Sergio Barajas (Defendant); Javier Barajas (Defendant); Barajas Family Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen P. Pfahler in Department F49 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less