Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 03:06:06 (UTC).

JESUS AGUILAR VS IL DEUNG GANPAN INC

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 JESUS AGUILAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IL DEUNG GANPAN INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3858

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AGUILAR JESUS

Defendants and Respondents

IL DEUNG GANPAN INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ANTHONY CHOE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/8/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/19/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order

4/10/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

8/25/2017: Unknown

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE - PREMISE LIABILITY; ETC

8/25/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE - PREMISE LIABILITY; ETC

SUMMONS

8/25/2017: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Serve) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Serve; Trial...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jesus Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE - PREMISE LIABILITY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Jesus Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC673858    Hearing Date: March 12, 2021    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JESUS AGUILAR,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

IL DEUNG GANPAN, INC., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC673858

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

March 12, 2021

 

Plaintiff, Jesus Aguilar (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendant Il Deung Ganpan, Inc. (“Defendant”) for damages Plaintiff sustained after being hired by Defendant to work on a construction job site.

On 6/26/19, Plaintiff obtained Defendant’s default. On 8/21/20, Plaintiff filed a Request for Dismissal dismissing all Doe defendants 1-100. Plaintiff now seeks entry of default judgment against Defendant. Plaintiff served Defendant with the summons, complaint, and related documents by substituted service on 3/19/19. (Prof of Service filed 3/19/19.) Plaintiff seeks default judgment in the total amount of $75,960.00, which includes $25,350 in special damages, $50,000 in general damages, and $610.

This matter was originally heard on 2/05/21, where the court ordered:

The Court will continue this matter for counsel to file supplemental documents supporting the item of Plaintiff seeking future medical expenses of $20,000. Plaintiff must provide competent evidence that he anticipates incurring additional medical expenses and supporting any amount requested. At this time the Court is unclear as to what the future medical treatment plaintiff is seeking damages.

(Min. Order 2/05/21.)

As of 3/8/21, Plaintiff filed to file any supplemental documents. The request is denied without prejudice for the reasons stated above.

Plaintiff is ordered to give any appropriate notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 12th day of March, 2021

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC673858    Hearing Date: February 05, 2021    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JESUS AGUILAR,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

IL DEUNG GANPAN, INC., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC673858

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

February 5, 2021

 

Plaintiff, Jesus Aguilar (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendant Il Deung Ganpan, Inc. (“Defendant”) for damages Plaintiff sustained after being hired by Defendant to work on a construction job site.

On 6/26/19, Plaintiff obtained Defendant’s default. On 8/21/20, Plaintiff filed a Request for Dismissal dismissing all Doe defendants 1-100. Plaintiff now seeks entry of default judgment against Defendant. Plaintiff served Defendant with the summons, complaint, and related documents by substituted service on 3/19/19. (Prof of Service filed 3/19/19.) Plaintiff seeks default judgment in the total amount of $75,960.00, which includes $25,350 in special damages, $50,000 in general damages, and $610.

The request is denied without prejudice for the following reasons:

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 5th day of February, 2021

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court