This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2020 at 11:47:46 (UTC).

JESUS ABEL MENDOZA ET AL VS KAREN ELIZABETH MENDOZA ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/02/2018 JESUS ABEL MENDOZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KAREN ELIZABETH MENDOZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4350

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MENDOZA JESUS ABEL

MENDOZA ABYGAYLE

LARA ESMERALDA

Defendants and Respondents

MENDOZA KAREN ELIZABETH

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

MENDOZA LUIS A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DAVIDSON LAURA LYNN ESQ.

WALLACE BRADLEY S.

Defendant Attorney

MAHLSTEDT JOY L

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2020

3/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Settlement

3/23/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

3/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Notice of Ruling

3/6/2020: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Continue Trial Date

2/4/2020: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Notice of Ruling

10/23/2019: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

10/16/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

10/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Notice of Change of Firm Name

10/7/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Demand for Jury Trial

7/10/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

7/10/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/2/2018: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

SUMMONS -

5/2/2018: SUMMONS -

Association of Attorney

2/13/2019: Association of Attorney

DEFENDANT, PETER JUNGHUN PARK'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/25/2018: DEFENDANT, PETER JUNGHUN PARK'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

5/2/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jesus Abel Mendoza (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Lara (Plaintiff); Abygayle Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/23/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Jesus Abel Mendoza (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Lara (Plaintiff); Abygayle Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Karen Elizabeth Mendoza (Defendant); Luis A. Mendoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Karen Elizabeth Mendoza (Defendant); Luis A. Mendoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jesus Abel Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jesus Abel Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Jesus Abel Mendoza (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Lara (Plaintiff); Abygayle Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT, PETER JUNGHUN PARK'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jesus Abel Mendoza (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Lara (Plaintiff); Abygayle Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC704350    Hearing Date: March 05, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

On May 2, 2018, plaintiffs Jesus Abel Mendoza, Esmeralda Lara, and Jessie Abygayle Mendoza (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) filed this action against defendants Karen Elizabeth Mendoza and Luis A. Mendoza (collectively, “Defendants”). Defendants seek an order continuing trial from March 6, 2020 to September 21, 2020 so Esmeralda Lara can to attend a medical examination on April 28, 2020. Plaintiffs do not oppose this motion.

A party seeking a continuance of the date set for trial must make the request for a continuance by a noticed motion or an ex parte application as soon as reasonably practical once the necessity for the continuance is discovered. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332(b).) The request for continuance may be granted on an affirmative showing of good cause. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332.)

Defendants have not shown good cause for a continuance to September 21, 2020. The new examination date is April 28, 2020. Defendants do not explain why they need five months after the medical examination to prepare for trial.

Accordingly ,the Court GRANTS the motion in part. Trial is continued to June 25, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 27 at Spring Street Courthouse. The Final Status Conference is continued to June 11, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 27 at Spring Street Courthouse. All discovery and motion cut-off dates to be based on the new trial date. The parties are to inform all experts and witnesses of the new trial date immediately.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.