This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 01:15:26 (UTC).

JESUS A RAMIREZ GONZALEZ VS ERIC SYLAN LEE ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/14/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by JESUS A RAMIREZ GONZALEZ against ERIC SYLAN LEE in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8035

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RAMIREZ-GONZALEZ JESUS A.

Defendants and Respondents

EXCEL TRUCKING SERVICES INC.

DOES 1 TO 20

LEE ERIC DYLAN

 

Court Documents

Notice

12/5/2018: Notice

Demand for Jury Trial

12/11/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice

12/11/2018: Notice

Notice

1/14/2019: Notice

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/28/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

SUMMONS

3/14/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

3/14/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Jesus A. Ramirez-Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Notice (NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY); Filed by Jesus A. Ramirez-Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Eric Dylan Lee (Defendant); Excel Trucking Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Notice (Notice of Depositing Jury Fees); Filed by Eric Dylan Lee (Defendant); Excel Trucking Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Eric Dylan Lee (Defendant); Excel Trucking Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Notice (And Acknowledgment Of Receipt Civil); Filed by Jesus A. Ramirez-Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Jesus A. Ramirez-Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC698035    Hearing Date: February 21, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

On March 14, 2018, plaintiff Jesus A. Ramirez-Gonzales filed this action against defendants Eric Dylan Lee and Excel Trucking Services, Inc. (collectively, “Defendants”) for injuries sustained in a March 15, 2016 accident involving two 18-wheeler tractor-trailers. Defendants move to continue the March 17, 2020 trial for six months. Plaintiff claims $355,000 in medical bills. Defendants argue they served subpoenas in May 2019 for Plaintiff’s medical records but have not received any documents. The subpoenaed third parties responded that they have no records for Plaintiff.

A party seeking a continuance of the date set for trial must make the request for a continuance by a noticed motion or an ex parte application as soon as reasonably practical once the necessity for the continuance is discovered. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332(b).) The request for continuance may be granted on an affirmative showing of good cause. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332.)

Defendants do not say whether they have served document requests on Plaintiff for his medical records or interrogatories asking him to identify the costs to date for his medical treatment. Plaintiff will need evidence of his medical bills at trial to support his claim for damages. If he claims $355,000 in medical bills, he must have some evidence of those bills. Defendant has not shown much diligence in serving discovery on Plaintiff.

The motion is GRANTED in part. The Court will continue the trial for three months and expects Defendant to act immediately and diligently in serving discovery and filing motions to compel if the responses are not forthcoming. Trial is continued to June 19, 2020. The Final Status Conference is continued to June 5, 2020. All dates are based on the new trial date. The parties are to inform all witness and experts of the new trial date. The parties should expect no further continuances.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.