This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/05/2021 at 01:15:59 (UTC).

JESSIE WU VS WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 JESSIE WU filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5560

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WU JESSIE

Defendants

WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT LLC

IMG WORLDWIDE INC.

CATES TONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NERI GEOFFREY A.

MESSIHA DOMINIC J.

Defendant Attorney

KAPUR VANDANA

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER- CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

7/15/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER- CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

10/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Separate Statement

10/2/2020: Separate Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/2/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion for Summary Judgment

10/2/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/8/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Settlement

12/4/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 12/08/2020

12/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 12/08/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

12/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Request for Dismissal

12/22/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

2/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Case Management Statement

12/17/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/20/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/30/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

9/25/2019: Answer

Answer

9/13/2019: Answer

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jessie Wu (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 12/08/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Jessie Wu (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jessie Wu (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC (Defendant); IMG Worldwide Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Tony Cates (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order ((Joint) to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Complaint and [Proposed] Order); Filed by William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC (Defendant); IMG Worldwide Inc. (Defendant); Tony Cates (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jessie Wu (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jessie Wu (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jessie Wu (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less