This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 18:59:16 (UTC).

JESSIE BALDIVIEZO, ET AL. VS US BANK, N.A., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 JESSIE BALDIVIEZO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against US BANK, N A . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2978

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BALDIVIEZO JESSIE

Defendant

US BANK N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN TODD MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

FIFE JOAN B TUCKER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

11/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES

6/16/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

5/20/2020: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL)

6/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL) OF 06/16/2020

6/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL) OF 06/16/2020

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE TO THE CLERK OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

5/7/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE TO THE CLERK OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

Notice - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

5/7/2020: Notice - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

4/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/18/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

2/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/18/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Initial Status Conference Order

2/18/2020: Initial Status Conference Order

Notice of Appearance

2/27/2020: Notice of Appearance

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/24/2020: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:15 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docketat 2:26 PM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Initial Status Conference and Related Deadlines); Filed by Jessie Baldiviezo (Plaintiff); US Bank, N.A. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Removal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Removal) of 06/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement (of Entire Case); Filed by Jessie Baldiviezo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Notice to Adverse Party of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court; Filed by US Bank, N.A. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Notice to the Clerk of the Superior Court of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court; Filed by US Bank, N.A. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/15/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by US Bank, N.A. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/18/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jessie Baldiviezo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jessie Baldiviezo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less