This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2022 at 11:14:55 (UTC).

JESSICA VELASQUEZ VS PLAZA WEST COVINA, LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 JESSICA VELASQUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PLAZA WEST COVINA, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7962

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELASQUEZ JESSICA

Defendants

PLAZA WEST COVINA LP

STARWOOD CAPITAL GROUP GLOBAL LLC

NATIONWIDE JANITORIAL SERVICES INC.

STARWOOD CAPITAL GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIORE MAURO

Defendant Attorney

GARRELL PETER E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/16/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

1/22/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/24/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/24/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

7/6/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/6/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2023
  • Hearing12/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • Hearing06/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Hearing06/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Plaza West Covina, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Plaza West Covina, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Nationwide Janitorial Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nationwide Janitorial Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jessica Velasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jessica Velasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jessica Velasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jessica Velasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jessica Velasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STARWOOD CAPITOL GROUP GLOBAL is a litigant

Latest cases where STARWOOD CAPITAL GROUP GLOBAL 1 L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationwide Janitorial Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PLAZA WEST COVINA INC is a litigant