This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2019 at 01:52:23 (UTC).

JESSICA MORATAYA ET AL VS OMNICARE MEDICAL GROUP INC

Case Summary

On 07/10/2018 JESSICA MORATAYA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against OMNICARE MEDICAL GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2998

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MORATAYA LAURA J.

MORATAYA JESSICA

PINO JOSHUA A.

JESSICA MORATAYA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF SANDRA MORENO

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

OMNICARE MEDICAL GROUP INC.

CONIFER PHYSICIAN SERVICES INC. DOE 2

VERITY HEALTH SYSTEM OF CALIFORNIA INC. DOE 5

CONIFER VALUE-BASED CARE LLC DOE1

QUALITY MEDICAL MANAGEMENT INC. DOE 3

ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER DOE 4

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

TYSCH GARY L. ESQ.

TYSCH GARY LEONARD ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

KHACHATRYAN KAREN

TESH MARY CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; 2. BREACH OF THE DUTY OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; AND; ETC.

9/18/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; 2. BREACH OF THE DUTY OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; AND; ETC.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/9/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Case Management Statement

11/20/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/26/2018: Case Management Statement

Answer

11/26/2018: Answer

Minute Order

12/3/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Continuance

12/4/2018: Notice of Continuance

Substitution of Attorney

3/1/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

3/4/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

3/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Case Management Statement

3/5/2019: Case Management Statement

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

3/5/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Motion for Leave

3/8/2019: Motion for Leave

Notice of Lodging

3/8/2019: Notice of Lodging

Notice of Ruling

3/25/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice

4/19/2019: Notice

Order

4/23/2019: Order

Minute Order

4/23/2019: Minute Order

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Omnicare Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Declaration (re Good Faith Attempt to Meet and Confer); Filed by Omnicare Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Jessica Morataya (Plaintiff); Laura J. Morataya (Plaintiff); Joshua A. Pino (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Jessica Morataya (Plaintiff); Laura J. Morataya (Plaintiff); Joshua A. Pino (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Jessica Morataya (Plaintiff); Laura J. Morataya (Plaintiff); Joshua A. Pino (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Notice ( of Order); Filed by Omnicare Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • at 4:11 PM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (Second Stiputlation and Order to Extend Time to File Response); Filed by Jessica Morataya (Plaintiff); Laura J. Morataya (Plaintiff); Joshua A. Pino (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (CIVIL); Filed by Jessica Morataya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Jessica Morataya (Plaintiff); Laura J. Morataya (Plaintiff); Joshua A. Pino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; 2. BREACH OF THE DUTY OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; AND; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Jessica Morataya (Plaintiff); Laura J. Morataya (Plaintiff); Joshua A. Pino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OMNICARE MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CONIFER VALUE-BASED CARE LLC A MARYLAND LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHACHATRYAN KEVIN