This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2019 at 11:09:49 (UTC).

JESSICA MARINO VS ADVANCED CRITICAL CARE EMERGENCY AND SPECI

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 JESSICA MARINO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ADVANCED CRITICAL CARE EMERGENCY AND SPECI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIHU M. BERLE and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2108

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIHU M. BERLE

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MARINO JESSICA

Defendants and Respondents

ADVANCED CRITICAL CARE EMERGENCY AND SPE

DOES 1 TO 20

LIBERSON HOWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MAKEREM & ASSOCIATES APLC

MAKAREM RONALD WAEL

WILLIAMS GENE FRANKLIN

Defendant Attorneys

KAHANA AMIR MOSHE

SHAHAM YARON

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

6/21/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Order

3/27/2019: Case Management Order

Notice of Related Case

4/22/2019: Notice of Related Case

Stipulation and Order

5/7/2019: Stipulation and Order

Certificate of Mailing for

5/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

5/10/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/23/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order

3/27/2019: Minute Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/4/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/10/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order

11/6/2018: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

11/6/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/15/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/15/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/10/2018: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

11/19/2018: Answer

Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

11/14/2018: Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

Complaint

9/17/2018: Complaint

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • Declaration of Gene Williams in Support of Request for Court Approval of Dismissal of Class Action Pursuant to CRC Rule 3.770; Filed by Jessica Marino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Jessica Marino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Joint Case Management Conference Statement; Filed by Jessica Marino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Advanced Critical Care, Emergency and Spe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Notice (of Court Minute Order); Filed by Advanced Critical Care, Emergency and Spe (Defendant); Howard Liberson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 4:32 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Notice of Related Case) of 05/10/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jessica Marino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service (of Summons); Filed by Jessica Marino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • at 4:17 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/06/2018 and Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Order (Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Jessica Marino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less