This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 21:53:22 (UTC).

JESSICA LOPEZ, ET AL. VS SANDRA PALOMINO

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 JESSICA LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SANDRA PALOMINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7816

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

AMBROSIO DONOVAN

LOPEZ JESSICA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

PALOMINO SANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANCHEZ MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

ARAKELYAN CRISTINA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/28/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

7/28/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

8/24/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Mail

10/7/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Related Case

10/7/2021: Notice of Related Case

Cross-Complaint

10/1/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

10/1/2021: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/1/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Mail

10/1/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Related Case

10/7/2021: Notice of Related Case

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2024
  • Hearing07/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • Hearing01/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Hearing01/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Sandra Palomino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Sandra Palomino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sandra Palomino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Sandra Palomino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by Sandra Palomino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Sandra Palomino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Sandra Palomino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jessica Lopez (Plaintiff); Donovan Ambrosio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jessica Lopez (Plaintiff); Donovan Ambrosio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jessica Lopez (Plaintiff); Donovan Ambrosio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jessica Lopez (Plaintiff); Donovan Ambrosio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARAKELYAN CRISTINA