Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 10:46:41 (UTC).

JESSICA LARA BRYAN ET AL VS EDGAR AMILCAR SANDOVAL ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/03/2017 JESSICA LARA BRYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EDGAR AMILCAR SANDOVAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8344

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

BRYAN JESSICA LARA

BRYAN MOLLY

Defendants and Respondents

EDGAR AMILCAR SANDOVAL

RS BUS LINE INC

DOES 1 TO 10

SANDOVAL EDGAR AMILCAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RICKS DAVID H. ESQ.

DAVID H. RICKS & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

BEAN HEATHER M.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

1/5/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/9/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/11/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT RS BUS LINE INC.ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLIANT

2/21/2018: DEFENDANT RS BUS LINE INC.ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLIANT

1EENDANT,EDGARAMILAR, AND0VAL'S ANSWER `[0 PJJATNTFFF?S COMPLAINT

3/2/2018: 1EENDANT,EDGARAMILAR, AND0VAL'S ANSWER `[0 PJJATNTFFF?S COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order

2/19/2019: Stipulation and Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/28/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/30/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

12/22/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/1/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/3/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial, FSC [And Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District)); Filed by JESSICA LARA BRYAN (Plaintiff); MOLLY BRYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • 1EENDANT,EDGARAMILAR, AND0VAL'S ANSWER `[0 PJJATNTFFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Answer; Filed by EDGAR AMILCAR SANDOVAL (Defendant); RS BUS LINE INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Answer; Filed by RS BUS LINE INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DEFENDANT RS BUS LINE INC.ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLIANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • at 3:45 PM in Department 93; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-11 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by JESSICA LARA BRYAN (Plaintiff); MOLLY BRYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL EXPARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by JESSICA LARA BRYAN (Plaintiff); MOLLY BRYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC678344    Hearing Date: November 24, 2020    Dept: 28

Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action

Having considered moving , the Court rules as follows. pposing papers have been filed.

BACKGROUND

On October 3, 2017, Plaintiff Jessica Lara Bryan and Molly Bryan filed a complaint against Defendants Edgar Amilcar Sandoval and RS Bus Line, Inc.  The plaintiffs allege general and motor vehicle negligence arising from an automobile collision that occurred on October 4, 2015.

On October 26, 2020, Petitioner Jessica Lara-Bryan a petition Molly Bryan.

PARTYS

Petitioner Jessica Lara-Bryan (“Petitioner”) asks to approve compromise of pending action Claimant Molly Bryan (“Claimant”).

LEGAL STANDARD

Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, subdivision (a), Petitioner and Claimant are Petitioner’s Claimants attendance are Claimants .

DISCUSSION

The Court finds the petition is properly approved.  All required information and attachments have been filed.  The $10,000.00 settlement is reasonable considering Claimant’s eyebrow abrasion and other minor cuts have healed.  The requested $2,500.00, or twenty-five percent of the gross settlement, in attorney’s fees is adequately justified considering the work performed in this action.  Accordingly, the petition is approved.

CONCLUSION

The petition is APPROVED.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Petitioner is ruling

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEAN HEATHER M.