This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2023 at 02:42:50 (UTC).

JESSICA IBARRA GRANILLO VS AVON PRODUCTS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2022 JESSICA IBARRA GRANILLO filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AVON PRODUCTS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4155

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IBARRA GRANILLO JESSICA

Defendants

AVON PRODUCTS INC.

BARRETTS MINERALS INC.

BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC FKA BAYER CONSUMER CARE LLC F/K/A MSD CONSUMER CARE INC. AND BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC A SUBSIDIARY OF BAYER AG

CHARLES B. CHRYSTAL COMPANY INC.

COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY

DORSETT & JACKSON INC.

L'OREAL USA INC.

MARY KAY INC.

MAYBELLINE LLC

SAFEWAY INC.

SEPHORA USA INC.

TARGET CORPORATION

ULTA BEAUTY INC

WALMART INC.

WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS INC.

ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC.

PRESPERSE CORPORATION

PRESPERSE INTERNATIONAL CORP

PLAYTEX MARKETING CORPORATION

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEPULVEDA AUTUMN ANNE

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO EDWARD R.

BEAL HOLLY C.

CROCHET CARLA LYNN

CHANG STEPHANIE C.

LUONG KAREN

MILBRODT JEREMY

ROBLES KIARA

KOLLER DAVID PAUL

VANDAM TINA

CARPENTER ERIN MATTHEW

BOISCLAIR CHRISTINE E.

HARRIS JAMES A

LADDON TARIFA B.

GOLDBERG KAREN B.

SACHS MICHAEL

STRUNK CHRISTOPHER

THACKSTON ROBERT E.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/12/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

5/12/2023: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

Notice - NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FOR BRILLIANT NATIONAL SERVICES, INC., L. A. TERMINALS, INC., SOCO WEST, INC., AND WHITTAKER, CLARK & DANIELS, INC. AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDI

4/28/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FOR BRILLIANT NATIONAL SERVICES, INC., L. A. TERMINALS, INC., SOCO WEST, INC., AND WHITTAKER, CLARK & DANIELS, INC. AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDI

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/28/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) - NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FOR BRILLIANT NATIONAL SERVICES, INC., L. A. TERMINALS, INC., SOCO WEST, INC., AND WHITTAKER, CLARK & DANIELS, INC. AND

4/28/2023: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) - NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FOR BRILLIANT NATIONAL SERVICES, INC., L. A. TERMINALS, INC., SOCO WEST, INC., AND WHITTAKER, CLARK & DANIELS, INC. AND

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/14/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer - DEFENDANT PLAYTEX PRODUCTS, LLC F/K/A PLAYTEX PRODUCTS, INC.S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; DEMND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/23/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT PLAYTEX PRODUCTS, LLC F/K/A PLAYTEX PRODUCTS, INC.S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; DEMND FOR JURY TRIAL

Request for Dismissal

3/3/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/23/2023: Request for Dismissal

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT PLAYTEX MARKETING CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

2/22/2023: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT PLAYTEX MARKETING CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP - (MAUNE RAICHLE HARTLEY FRENCH &...)

2/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP - (MAUNE RAICHLE HARTLEY FRENCH &...)

Proof of Personal Service

1/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Substitution of Attorney

1/18/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/12/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/12/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

1/12/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

Answer - DEFENDANT TARGET CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/6/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT TARGET CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2023
  • Hearing10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • Hearing08/02/2023 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos; Filed by: Merck & Co., Inc. (Defendant); As to: Jessica Ibarra Granillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Merck & Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Suggestion of Bankruptcy for Brilliant National Services, Inc., L. A. Terminals, Inc., Soco West, Inc., and Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. and Notice of Automatic Stay of Proceedings: Name Extension: blank ; Document changed from Notice (name extension) to Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Suggestion of Bankruptcy for Brilliant National Services, Inc., L. A. Terminals, Inc., Soco West, Inc., and Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. and Notice of Automatic Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: Jessica Ibarra Granillo (Plaintiff); As to: Merck & Co., Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 04/20/2023; Service Cost: 372.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Suggestion of Bankruptcy for Brilliant National Services, Inc., L. A. Terminals, Inc., Soco West, Inc., and Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. and Notice of Automatic Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. (Defendant); Bankruptcy Stay Case Type: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Bankruptcy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Jessica Ibarra Granillo (Plaintiff); As to: Merck & Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Fact Sheet; Filed by: Jessica Ibarra Granillo (Plaintiff); As to: Avon Products, Inc. (Defendant); Barretts Minerals, Inc. (Defendant); Bayer Consumer Care Holdings, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Demand for Jury and Posting of Advanced Jury Fees; Filed by: Jessica Ibarra Granillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stuart M. Rice in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jessica Ibarra Granillo (Plaintiff); As to: Avon Products, Inc. (Defendant); Barretts Minerals, Inc. (Defendant); Bayer Consumer Care Holdings, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jessica Ibarra Granillo (Plaintiff); As to: Avon Products, Inc. (Defendant); Barretts Minerals, Inc. (Defendant); Bayer Consumer Care Holdings, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jessica Ibarra Granillo (Plaintiff); As to: Avon Products, Inc. (Defendant); Barretts Minerals, Inc. (Defendant); Bayer Consumer Care Holdings, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less