This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2022 at 11:02:40 (UTC).

JESSICA FUNG FUN NG, TRUSTEE TO THE SURVIVOR'S TRUST OF THE WILLIAM AND JESSICA NG FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 21, 2010 VS PREFERRED REMODELING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 JESSICA FUNG FUN NG, TRUSTEE TO THE SURVIVOR'S TRUST OF THE WILLIAM AND JESSICA NG FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 21, 2010 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PREFERRED REMODELING, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0361

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESSICA FUNG FUN NG TRUSTEE TO THE SURVIVOR'S TRUST OF THE WILLIAM AND JESSICA NG FAMILY TRUST

Defendants

PREFERRED REMODELING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PREFERRED REMODELING & DEVELOPMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA PREFERRED REMODELING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OSBORN JEFFREY T.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/23/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/17/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

11/9/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/1/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

12/20/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by JESSICA FUNG FUN NG, TRUSTEE TO THE SURVIVOR'S TRUST OF THE WILLIAM AND JESSICA NG FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 21, 2010 on 11/09/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by JESSICA FUNG FUN NG, TRUSTEE TO THE SURVIVOR'S TRUST OF THE WILLIAM AND JESSICA NG FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 21, 2010 as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: JESSICA FUNG FUN NG, TRUSTEE TO THE SURVIVOR'S TRUST OF THE WILLIAM AND JESSICA NG FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 21, 2010 (Plaintiff); As to: Preferred Remodeling & Development, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: JESSICA FUNG FUN NG, TRUSTEE TO THE SURVIVOR'S TRUST OF THE WILLIAM AND JESSICA NG FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 21, 2010 (Plaintiff); As to: Preferred Remodeling & Development, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/17/2022; Service Cost: 77.05; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JESSICA FUNG FUN NG, TRUSTEE TO THE SURVIVOR'S TRUST OF THE WILLIAM AND JESSICA NG FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 21, 2010 (Plaintiff); As to: Preferred Remodeling & Development, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: JESSICA FUNG FUN NG, TRUSTEE TO THE SURVIVOR'S TRUST OF THE WILLIAM AND JESSICA NG FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 21, 2010 (Plaintiff); As to: Preferred Remodeling & Development, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 02/10/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen P. Pfahler in Department F49 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JESSICA FUNG FUN NG, TRUSTEE TO THE SURVIVOR'S TRUST OF THE WILLIAM AND JESSICA NG FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 21, 2010 (Plaintiff); As to: PREFERRED REMODELING, INC. a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JESSICA FUNG FUN NG, TRUSTEE TO THE SURVIVOR'S TRUST OF THE WILLIAM AND JESSICA NG FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 21, 2010 (Plaintiff); As to: PREFERRED REMODELING, INC. a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JESSICA FUNG FUN NG, TRUSTEE TO THE SURVIVOR'S TRUST OF THE WILLIAM AND JESSICA NG FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 21, 2010 (Plaintiff); As to: PREFERRED REMODELING, INC. a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less