This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 19:40:42 (UTC).

JESSICA ESCOBAR, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 JESSICA ESCOBAR filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5133

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESCOBAR JESSICA

ESCOBAR PETER

HARVEY KATHY

MCINTOSH REEF

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLIN STEPHANIE ELYSE

 

Court Documents

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR CHANEL

5/9/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR CHANEL

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/6/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/6/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/6/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Complaint

5/6/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/6/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jessica Escobar (Plaintiff); Reef Mcintosh (Plaintiff); Kathy Harvey (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Chanel); Filed by Jessica Escobar (Plaintiff); Reef Mcintosh (Plaintiff); Kathy Harvey (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jessica Escobar (Plaintiff); Reef Mcintosh (Plaintiff); Kathy Harvey (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jessica Escobar (Plaintiff); Reef Mcintosh (Plaintiff); Kathy Harvey (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jessica Escobar (Plaintiff); Reef Mcintosh (Plaintiff); Kathy Harvey (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLIN STEPHANIE ELYSE