This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 22:47:20 (UTC).

JESSICA CLEMENTS VS AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF ADDICTION MEDICINE, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 JESSICA CLEMENTS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF ADDICTION MEDICINE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5494

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEMENTS JESSICA

Defendant

AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF ADDICTION MEDICINE LLC DBA RECOVERY GUILD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOLGUIN VIDA MONICA

GILLAM CAROL MCCULLY

Defendant Attorneys

CAMPAIN ALBERTO JAVIER

ECOFF LAWRENCE CRAIG

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/21/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/30/2020

4/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/30/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/01/2020

4/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/01/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER DUE TO ITS SUS...)

12/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER DUE TO ITS SUS...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER DUE TO ITS SUS...) OF 12/05/2019

12/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER DUE TO ITS SUS...) OF 12/05/2019

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

10/29/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/16/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER

10/22/2019: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER DUE TO ITS SUS...)

10/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER DUE TO ITS SUS...)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

8/28/2019: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

7/18/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Substitution of Attorney

5/13/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/19/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • Hearing02/28/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Hearing02/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Further Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Carol McCully Gillam (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 57; Jury Trial (, 7-10 day estimate,) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 57; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Docketat 11:43 AM in Department 57; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jessica Clements (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by American Institute of Addiction Medicine, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by American Institute of Addiction Medicine, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by American Institute of Addiction Medicine, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jessica Clements (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jessica Clements (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAMPAIN ALBERTO JAVIER ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ECOFF BLUT, LLP - LAWRENCE C. ECOFF