This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 17:33:38 (UTC).

JESSICA CESENA VS JYM ENTERPRISES, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 JESSICA CESENA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JYM ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7949

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CESENA JESSICA

Defendant

JYM ENTERPRISES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHKODNIK ROMAN

YEREMIAN DAVID HARMIK

HAINES WALTER LEWIS

Defendant Attorneys

AGHNAMI SANAM

ROSENKRANZ ANDREA LEIGH

SGNILEK MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/29/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE) OF 08/06/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

8/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE) OF 08/06/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

8/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

Initial Status Conference Order

8/6/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Notice - NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER DEEMING CASE COMPLEX

8/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER DEEMING CASE COMPLEX

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/4/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

10/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

10/7/2021: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

Status Report

10/7/2021: Status Report

Notice of Appearance

10/6/2021: Notice of Appearance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SUMMONS JYM ENTERPRISES, INC.

10/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SUMMONS JYM ENTERPRISES, INC.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (Summons JYM Enterprises, Inc.); Filed by Jessica Cesena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order Authorizing Electronic Service); Filed by Jessica Cesena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by JYM Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketOrder (Authorizing Electronic Service (Case Anywhere)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by JYM Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Jessica Cesena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Initial Status Conference and Order Deeming Case Complex; Filed by Jessica Cesena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketProof Of Service Summons; Filed by Jessica Cesena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:56 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case) of 08/06/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jessica Cesena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jessica Cesena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JYM ENTERPRISES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENKRANZ ANDREA LEIGH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SGNILEK MATTHEW