This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 07:25:42 (UTC).

JESSICA BROWN VS SIDNEY ROYAL SELBY

Case Summary

On 02/27/2018 JESSICA BROWN filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against SIDNEY ROYAL SELBY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY J. FUJIE and MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5713

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY J. FUJIE

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN JESSICA

Defendants

SELBY SIDNEY ROYAL

DESIIGNER PKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DIGGS RODNEY S. ESQ.

DIGGS RODNEY SEAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CMC AND DECLARATION OF RODNEY DIGGS

6/15/2018: NOTICE OF CMC AND DECLARATION OF RODNEY DIGGS

Minute Order

6/28/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF DEFAULT AND LIVE PROVE UP HEARING SET FOR AUGUST 27, 2018

7/23/2018: NOTICE OF DEFAULT AND LIVE PROVE UP HEARING SET FOR AUGUST 27, 2018

Minute Order

8/27/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF MARINA SAMSON RECARDING THE PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

9/13/2018: DECLARATION OF MARINA SAMSON RECARDING THE PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

9/19/2018: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

9/19/2018: ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

Minute Order

9/19/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Publication

11/13/2018: Proof of Publication

Minute Order

11/13/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/12/2018: Minute Order

Request

1/24/2019: Request

Minute Order

1/25/2019: Minute Order

Declaration

1/25/2019: Declaration

Declaration

1/25/2019: Declaration

Declaration

1/25/2019: Declaration

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

1/30/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Judgment

1/30/2019: Judgment

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Jessica Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Docketat 4:46 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/26/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketJudgment (Amended); Filed by Jessica Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketRequest (Request for An Order Correcting The Judgment Form); Filed by Jessica Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Marina Samson re Plaintiff's Order to Correct the Judgment Form); Filed by Jessica Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Default Prove Up Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketAmended Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-03-16 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Jessica Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jessica Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. DEFAMATION (LIBEL PER SE)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Rodney S. Diggs, Esq. (SBN 274459) rdiggs@imwlaw.com

Chandler Parker, Esq. (SBN 277902) cparker@zmwlaw com

Marina Samson, Esq. (SBN 315024) msamson@zmwlaw com

IVIE, McNEILL & WYATT

A Professional Law Corporation 444 South Flower Street, Suite 1800 Los Angeles, California 90071 Telephone: (213) 489-0028 Facsimile: (213) 489-0552

Attorneys for Plaintiff, JESSICA BROWN

FILED

Superisr Court of California Conntv of T .ac Anoeles

MAY 23 2018

Sherri R Caufinmum uticeriClerk of Churt By(Qh.& §&:f—__:;,’-—i)enu v

Tant Q-

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

JESSICA BROWN, an individual, Plaintiffs,

- VS,

SIDNEY ROYAL SELBY, an individual PKA

DESIIGNER

| Defendants.

CASENO. BC695713 DEFT G

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Page 1

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIGGS RODNEY S. ESQ.