This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 05:03:16 (UTC).

JESSICA BETTS VS GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 JESSICA BETTS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0073

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BETTS JESSICA

Defendants

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC.

GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES LP

GLENDALE II MALL ASSOCIATES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAKIM SHARONA ESLAMBOLY

Defendant Attorney

WAYNE ADAM

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/12/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/12/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/13/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/13/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/3/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/3/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/3/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

4/5/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Answer

5/16/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • Hearing06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Adam Wayne (Attorney): Organization Name changed from WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP to Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketAddress for Adam Wayne (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Glendale I Mall Associates, LP (Defendant); Brookfield Properties Retail Inc. (Defendant); As to: Jessica Betts (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D updated: Result Date to 04/05/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jessica Betts (Plaintiff); As to: Brookfield Properties Retail Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jessica Betts (Plaintiff); As to: Glendale I Mall Associates, LP (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jessica Betts (Plaintiff); As to: Glendale II Mall Associates, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Sharona Eslamboly Hakim (Attorney): Last Name changed from Eslamboly-Hakim to Hakim; Middle Name: Eslamboly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketAddress for Sharona Eslamboly Hakim (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ralph C. Hofer in Department D Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jessica Betts (Plaintiff); As to: Glendale I Mall Associates, LP (Defendant); Glendale II Mall Associates, LLC (Defendant); Brookfield Properties Retail Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jessica Betts (Plaintiff); As to: Glendale I Mall Associates, LP (Defendant); Glendale II Mall Associates, LLC (Defendant); Brookfield Properties Retail Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jessica Betts (Plaintiff); As to: Glendale I Mall Associates, LP (Defendant); Glendale II Mall Associates, LLC (Defendant); Brookfield Properties Retail Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less