Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2021 at 14:39:31 (UTC).

JESSICA AVALOS, ET AL. VS RESIDENTIAL FIRE SYSTEMS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 JESSICA AVALOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RESIDENTIAL FIRE SYSTEMS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8358

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AVALOS JESSICA

MARQUEZ MARTHA

Defendants

RESIDENTIAL FIRE SYSTEMS INC.

SEVERIN NICOLE LEIGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAHAGUN BRYAN OWENS

Defendant Attorney

HONEY ANNE M.

 

Court Documents

Answer

4/9/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/14/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ARES

2/25/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ARES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

1/22/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ARES

1/22/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ARES

PI General Order

1/22/2021: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/18/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2023
  • Hearing12/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Hearing06/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Hearing06/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jessica Avalos (Plaintiff); Martha Marquez (Plaintiff); Ares Lopez, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Jessica Avalos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Residential Fire Systems, Inc. (Defendant); Nicole Leigh Severin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Residential Fire Systems, Inc. (Defendant); Nicole Leigh Severin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (For ARES); Filed by Jessica Avalos (Plaintiff); Martha Marquez (Plaintiff); Ares Lopez, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Jessica Avalos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jessica Avalos (Plaintiff); Martha Marquez (Plaintiff); Ares Lopez, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Jessica Avalos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Ares); Filed by Jessica Avalos (Plaintiff); Martha Marquez (Plaintiff); Ares Lopez, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Jessica Avalos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bryan Owens Sahagun (Attorney); Jessica Avalos (Plaintiff); Martha Marquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bryan Owens Sahagun (Attorney); Jessica Avalos (Plaintiff); Martha Marquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESIDENTIAL FIRE SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAHAGUN BRYAN OWENS