This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2021 at 00:25:45 (UTC).

JESSE VAYNER, ET AL. VS KAMRAN TORBATI, M.D., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 JESSE VAYNER, filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against KAMRAN TORBATI, M D ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0928

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIRZHNER ELENA

VAYNER JESSE

Defendants

PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL CENTER

A CENTER FOR COMPREHENSIVE WOMEN'S HEALTH A PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL CORPORATION

TORBATI KAMRAN M.D.

KAMRAN TORBATI M.D. INC.

Not Classified By Court

PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEMS - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DBA PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL CENTER ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FREEZE TAMARA

IKUTA BENJAMIN T

Defendant Attorneys

CARROLL RICHARD DOUGLAS

CLARK BRADLEY C

 

Court Documents

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JESSE

8/6/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JESSE

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/21/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Demand for Jury Trial

8/27/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

8/27/2020: Answer

Answer

9/23/2020: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER STRIKING A PORTION OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANTS KAMRAN TORBATI, M.D., A CENTER FOR COMPREHENSIVE WOMEN'S HEALTH,

9/23/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER STRIKING A PORTION OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANTS KAMRAN TORBATI, M.D., A CENTER FOR COMPREHENSIVE WOMEN'S HEALTH,

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE STIPULATION

10/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE STIPULATION

Association of Attorney

12/15/2020: Association of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

3/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

4/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS - NOT RESOLVED

4/20/2021: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS - NOT RESOLVED

Answer

4/29/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION

5/13/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION

Motion for Summary Judgment

5/13/2021: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement

5/13/2021: Separate Statement

Request for Dismissal

6/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/2/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal

6/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 31; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Jesse Vayner (Plaintiff); Elena Kirzhner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jesse Vayner (Plaintiff); Elena Kirzhner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jesse Vayner (Plaintiff); Elena Kirzhner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Jesse Vayner (Plaintiff); Elena Kirzhner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF FILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION); Filed by PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jesse Vayner (Plaintiff); Elena Kirzhner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jesse Vayner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jesse Vayner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF COUNSEL KATHLEEN D. McCOLGAN RE: INABILITY OF DEFENDANTS, KAMRAN TORBATI, M.D. AND KAMRAN TORBATI, M.D., INC., TO COMPLY WITH MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT REGARDING DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT [C.C.P. 430.41(a)(2)]); Filed by Kamran Torbati, M.D. (Defendant); KAMRAN TORBATI, M.D., INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jesse Vayner (Plaintiff); Elena Kirzhner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jesse Vayner (Plaintiff); Elena Kirzhner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jesse Vayner (Plaintiff); Elena Kirzhner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLARK BRADLEY C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARROLL RICHARD D. ESQ.