This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 17:15:32 (UTC).

JESSE OBREGON VS SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 JESSE OBREGON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1672

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OBREGON JESSE

Defendants

MEB LOAN TRUST IV

NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARA TONY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/26/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

9/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

10/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jesse Obregon (Plaintiff); Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jesse Obregon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jesse Obregon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jesse Obregon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jesse Obregon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jesse Obregon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jesse Obregon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meb Loan Trust Iii Us Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARA TONY