This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2023 at 00:47:30 (UTC).

JESSE FRANKLIN ESPHORST VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 JESSE FRANKLIN ESPHORST filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1531

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESPHORST JESSE

Claimant

CALIFORNIA VICTIM COMPENSATION BOARD

Defendants and Cross Defendants

TORRANCE CITY OF

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

MING TUNG

HICKS DARRYL LEANDER

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

SHAWNAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARDIROSSIAN GARO ESQ.

Claimant Attorney

DELAINI LARENDA RAI

Defendant Attorneys

WESIERSKI & ZUREK LLP

HYDE SHERAL A.

SPRADLIN DANIEL KEVIN ESQ.

STEWART BRIAN K. ESQ.

VUONG NENA T. DEPUTY ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/14/2021

6/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/14/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 06/14/2021

6/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 06/14/2021

Notice of Lien

6/5/2020: Notice of Lien

Notice of Lien - NOTICE OF AMENDED LIEN

12/18/2019: Notice of Lien - NOTICE OF AMENDED LIEN

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT TUNG MING TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/14/2019: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT TUNG MING TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER OF CITY OF TORRANCE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/30/2018: Answer - ANSWER OF CITY OF TORRANCE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER OF CITY OF TORRANCE TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF TUNG MING

8/30/2018: Answer - ANSWER OF CITY OF TORRANCE TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF TUNG MING

Request for Refund / Order

9/27/2018: Request for Refund / Order

Answer -

10/11/2018: Answer -

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

10/19/2018: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Request for Dismissal

2/4/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/4/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Lien

6/14/2019: Notice of Lien

CROSS-DEFENDANT SHAWNAN'S ANSWER TO THE UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF TUNG MING

9/12/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT SHAWNAN'S ANSWER TO THE UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF TUNG MING

DEFENDANT SHAWNAN'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/12/2018: DEFENDANT SHAWNAN'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CITY OF TORRANCE FOR EQUITABLE APPORTIONMENT, INDEMNITY AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

8/30/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CITY OF TORRANCE FOR EQUITABLE APPORTIONMENT, INDEMNITY AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

ANSWER OF CITY OF TORRANCE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/30/2018: ANSWER OF CITY OF TORRANCE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8 - Hon. Ronald F. Frankeffective 10/10/2022; Reason: Transfer for Reassignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order) of 06/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/14/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Not Related

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Marc D. Gross 8:30 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Marc D. Gross 8:30 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by: California Victim Compensation Board (Claimant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Amended Lien; Filed by: California Victim Compensation Board (Claimant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketProceeding/Event:Jury Trial Marc D. Gross 8:30 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketDocument:Affidavit - misc Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less