This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 06:34:25 (UTC).

JESSE BERENT VS SUMI SIEGEL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 JESSE BERENT filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SUMI SIEGEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN, SAMANTHA JESSNER, STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH, GREGORY W. ALARCON, MARK V. MOONEY and MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7559

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

SAMANTHA JESSNER

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

GREGORY W. ALARCON

MARK V. MOONEY

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

BERENT JESSE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SIEGEL SUMI

ELSESSER CHARLES

MASSIE CHARLES "MAX"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

OKOROCHA OKORIE

OKOROCHA OKORIE CHUKWUDIMMA

BERENT JASON M.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH MARILYN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE THAT DEFENDANTS DID NOT RECEIVE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

10/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE THAT DEFENDANTS DID NOT RECEIVE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

9/13/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

7/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

6/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

7/6/2021: Answer

Notice of Related Case

2/23/2021: Notice of Related Case

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

4/28/2021: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Answer

5/4/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

5/4/2021: Cross-Complaint

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/25/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Order - ORDER PROPOSED TO GRANT APPLICATION

4/1/2021: Order - ORDER PROPOSED TO GRANT APPLICATION

Case Management Statement

4/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF STIPULATION REGARDING DEMURRERS, MOTIONS TO STRIKE, PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO FILE ANSWERS TO SAME

4/5/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF STIPULATION REGARDING DEMURRERS, MOTIONS TO STRIKE, PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO FILE ANSWERS TO SAME

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); H...)

4/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); H...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE SHARON CAHN 6210

3/25/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE SHARON CAHN 6210

Order - ORDER ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT CHARLES ELSESSER TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/25/2021: Order - ORDER ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT CHARLES ELSESSER TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Case Management Statement

3/30/2021: Case Management Statement

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Sumi Siegel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Sharon Cahn 6210)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketResponse (PLAINTIFF JESSE BERENT?S BRIEF RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT SUMI SIEGEL?S MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS); Filed by Jesse Berent (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE THAT DEFENDANTS DID NOT RECEIVE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL); Filed by Sumi Siegel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Plaintiff to Provide Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One); Filed by Sumi Siegel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (...) of 12/10/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketApplication to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Filed by Jesse Berent (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by Charles Elsesser (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jesse Berent (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jesse Berent (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jesse Berent (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OKOROCHA OKORIE