This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2022 at 05:18:08 (UTC).

JESSE ALCANTARA, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, SUSAN ALCANTARA VS LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 JESSE ALCANTARA, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, SUSAN ALCANTARA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9554

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALCANTARA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM SUSAN ALCANTARA JESSE

Defendants

LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT

RANCHO STARBUCK INTERMEDIATE SCHOOL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IRRIBARREN GIANCARLO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR JESSE

11/27/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR JESSE

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

9/17/2020: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

11/18/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Notice of Settlement

11/18/2020: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Change of Firm Name

11/18/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 11/19/2020

11/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 11/19/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

11/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF M...) OF 02/03/2021

2/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF M...) OF 02/03/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF M...)

2/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF M...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

5/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

7/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

8/2/2021: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

9/22/2021: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

9/22/2021: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

9/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

12/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

10/2/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • Hearing02/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Hearing02/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Jesse Alcantara, a minor by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Susan Alcantara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Jesse Alcantara, a minor by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Susan Alcantara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Jesse Alcantara, a minor by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Susan Alcantara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Jesse Alcantara, a minor by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Susan Alcantara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (for Jesse)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Jesse Alcantara, a minor by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Susan Alcantara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (for Jesse)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jesse Alcantara, a minor by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Susan Alcantara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jesse Alcantara, a minor by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Susan Alcantara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT A CA PUBLIC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IRRIBARREN GIANCARLO