This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:13:01 (UTC).

JESIKA CAMACHO VS SALATIEL CRUZ, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/10/2017 JESIKA CAMACHO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SALATIEL CRUZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6982

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMACHO JESIKA

Defendants

CRUZ SALATIEL

EBERHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KISTLER PAUL M.

Defendant Attorney

O'CONNOR EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment

8/10/2017: Notice of Case Assignment

Complaint

8/10/2017: Complaint

CoverSheet

8/10/2017: CoverSheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

9/27/2017: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/6/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

10/16/2017: Unknown

SALATIEL CRUZ'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/18/2017: SALATIEL CRUZ'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

8/9/2018: Unknown

Unknown

8/31/2018: Unknown

Order - Dismissal

8/31/2018: Order - Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

1/29/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by JESIKA CAMACHO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to this date & continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Order - Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Stipulation and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, Fsc (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Pers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by SALATIEL CRUZ (Defendant); EBERHARD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Answer; Filed by SALATIEL CRUZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • SALATIEL CRUZ'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by JESIKA CAMACHO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Answer; Filed by EBERHARD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Summons; Filed by JESIKA CAMACHO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by JESIKA CAMACHO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.