This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/11/2022 at 01:23:17 (UTC).

JESHEBEAB CONNER, AN INDIVIDUAL VS KARINA KEZEKIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 JESHEBEAB CONNER, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KARINA KEZEKIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4177

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONNER AN INDIVIDUAL JESHEBEAB

Defendants

NAZARETION AN INDIVIDUAL PIERRE

KEZEKIAN AN INDIVIDUAL KARINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRADKIN IGOR

Defendant Attorney

CARRON PAUL ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/14/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

5/3/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

5/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Answer

8/10/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

8/10/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/14/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/28/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2024
  • Hearing04/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • Hearing09/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by KARINA KEZEKIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant); PIERRE NAZARETION, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by KARINA KEZEKIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant); PIERRE NAZARETION, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by KARINA KEZEKIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant); PIERRE NAZARETION, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by KARINA KEZEKIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant); PIERRE NAZARETION, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by JESHEBEAB CONNER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JESHEBEAB CONNER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JESHEBEAB CONNER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JESHEBEAB CONNER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JESHEBEAB CONNER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRADKIN IGOR