This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2022 at 14:11:27 (UTC).

JERRY TAYLOR, JR. VS AVANI HOME, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 JERRY TAYLOR, JR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AVANI HOME, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL E. WHITAKER and STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7589

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAYLOR SR. JERRY

Defendants

BAGORO HERBERT A.

AVANI HOME INC. A BUSINESS ENTITY

TRINITY A.R.F. INCORPORATION

TRINITY CARE ARF LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HOFFMAN BRIAN L.

GASKINS JORDAN R

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

10/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 10/20/2022

10/20/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 10/20/2022

Order - Dismissal

10/20/2022: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/29/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Judgment - [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT RE PLAINTIFF'S ACCEPTANCE OF 998 OFFER TO COMPROMISE BY DEFENDANTS AVANI HOME CARE, INC. AND HERBART A. BAGORO

4/4/2022: Judgment - [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT RE PLAINTIFF'S ACCEPTANCE OF 998 OFFER TO COMPROMISE BY DEFENDANTS AVANI HOME CARE, INC. AND HERBART A. BAGORO

Judgment - [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT RE PLAINTIFF'S ACCEPTANCE OF 998 OFFER TO COMPROMISE BY DEFENDANTS AVANI HOME CARE, INC. AND HERBART A. BAGORO

4/4/2022: Judgment - [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT RE PLAINTIFF'S ACCEPTANCE OF 998 OFFER TO COMPROMISE BY DEFENDANTS AVANI HOME CARE, INC. AND HERBART A. BAGORO

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

3/10/2022: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Notice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S ACCEPTANCE OF 998 OFFER TO COMPROMISE BY DEFENDANTS AVANI HOME CARE, INC. AND HERBERT A. BAGORO

1/19/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S ACCEPTANCE OF 998 OFFER TO COMPROMISE BY DEFENDANTS AVANI HOME CARE, INC. AND HERBERT A. BAGORO

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

1/20/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/25/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/25/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/25/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/25/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/29/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

10/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

Proof of Personal Service

9/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Jerry Taylor, Jr., et al. on 11/20/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Trinity Care ARF, LLC. and Trinity A.R.F. Incorporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Jury Trial) of 10/20/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 10/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketStipulated judgment entered for Defendant Avani Home, Inc., a business entity and Defendant Herbert A. Bagoro, an individual against Plaintiff Jerry Taylor Jr., by and through his guardian ad litem, Jerry Taylor, Sr. and Plaintiff Jerry Taylor, Sr. on the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Jerry Taylor, Jr., et al. on 11/20/2020 for a total of $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • Docket[PROPOSED] JUDGMENT RE PLAINTIFF'S ACCEPTANCE OF 998 OFFER TO COMPROMISE BY DEFENDANTS AVANI HOME CARE, INC. AND HERBART A. BAGORO; Signed and Filed by: Avani Home, Inc., a business entity (Defendant); Herbert A. Bagoro (Defendant); As to: Jerry Taylor, Jr. (Plaintiff); Jerry Taylor, Sr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT RE PLAINTIFF'S ACCEPTANCE OF 998 OFFER TO COMPROMISE BY DEFENDANTS AVANI HOME CARE, INC. AND HERBART A. BAGORO: Filed By: Herbert A. Bagoro (Defendant),Avani Home, Inc., a business entity (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 04/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jerry Taylor, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Avani Home, Inc., a business entity (Defendant); Herbert A. Bagoro (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch in Department 5 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jerry Taylor, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jerry Taylor, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Avani Home, Inc., a business entity (Defendant); Herbert A. Bagoro (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jerry Taylor, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/06/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Status Date changed from 10/31/2019 to 10/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: *******7589 Hearing Date: October 29, 2021 Dept: 32

PLEASE NOTE: Parties are encouraged to meet and confer concerning this tentative ruling to determine if a resolution may be reached. If the parties are unable to reach a resolution and a party intends to submit on this tentative ruling, the party must send an email to the Court at sscdept32@lacourt.org indicating that party’s intention to submit. The email shall include the case number, date and time of the hearing, counsel’s contact information (if applicable), and the identity of the party submitting on this tentative ruling. If the Court does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on this tentative ruling and there are no appearances at the hearing, the Court may place the motion off calendar. If all parties do not submit on this tentative ruling, they should arrange to appear in-person or remotely (which is highly encouraged). Further, after the Court has posted/issued a tentative ruling, the Court has the inherent authority to prohibit the withdrawal of the subject motion and adopt the tentative ruling as the order of the Court.

TENTATIVE RULING

DEPARTMENT

32

HEARING DATE

October 29, 2021

CASE NUMBER

*******7589

MOTION

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

MOVING PARTY

Raymond Ghermezian

OPPOSING PARTY

None

MOTION

Raymond Ghermezian PLC (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Jerry Taylor, Jr, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Jerry Taylor, Sr. (collectively, “Plaintiff”).

ANALYSIS

Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on form MC-053. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for the motion are differences have arose between Counsel and Plaintiff related to the prosecution of the action, creating a breakdown in the attorney-client relationship. This is a valid reason for withdrawal. (See Rules Prof. Conduct, rule 1.16.) Accordingly, the Court grants the motion.

Counsel must serve the signed order (form MC-053), which shall include information about all future hearings and proceedings noticed by any party, or ordered by the Court, on Plaintiff and all other parties who have appeared in the action, within 10 days of the date of this Order, and file a proof of service of such. Counsel will remain the attorney of record for Plaintiff until Counsel files the requisite proof of service. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(e).)

'


Case Number: *******7589    Hearing Date: December 01, 2020    Dept: 32

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

jerry taylor, jr.,

Plaintiff,

v.

avani home, inc., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: *******7589

Hearing Date: December 1, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

demurrer to complaint

Plaintiff Jerry Taylor, Jr. (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Avani Home, Inc. and Herbert A. Bagoro, alleging that he slipped and fell on a certain walkway within the City of Azusa, California. Plaintiff asserts causes of action for negligence and premises liability. Plaintiff filed his complaint on October 22, 2019, to which Defendant Herberg A. Bagoro demurred. Prior to the hearing, Plaintiff filed a first amended complaint. Therefore, the demurrer is overruled as moot. Defendants shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: December 1, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court