This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 15:28:32 (UTC).

JERRY PENNEY VS FPI MANAGEMENT, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 JERRY PENNEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FPI MANAGEMENT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3914

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNEY JERRY

Defendants

EMERALD HILLS LLC.

FPI MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PSYHOGIOS ROSS JAMES

PSYHOGIOS ROSS JAMES ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BALDWIN KATHRYNE E.

CORELESS THOMAS C

CAPINELLI MAX G

CARPINELLI MAX G. ESQ.

CORLESS THOMAS CONDIE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

1/5/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Substitution of Attorney

3/4/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

3/30/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/23/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/3/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer

11/12/2019: Answer

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

10/25/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

10/8/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CCP...)

10/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CCP...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CCP...) OF 10/11/2019

10/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CCP...) OF 10/11/2019

Proof of Personal Service

10/16/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/24/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/24/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/24/2019: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • Hearing09/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Hearing05/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Hearing05/09/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Jerry Penney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by FPI Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by FPI Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jerry Penney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Emerald Hills, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Jerry Penney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jerry Penney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docketat 2:48 PM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (CCP...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (CCP...) of 10/11/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Jerry Penney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jerry Penney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jerry Penney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jerry Penney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMERALD HILLS LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PSYHOGIOS, ROSS J