This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2021 at 15:58:10 (UTC).

JERRY NYINGIFA VS SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 JERRY NYINGIFA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2252

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NYINGIFA JERRY

Defendants

AFFINIA DEFAULT SERVICES LLC

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS SUCCESSOR INDENTURE TRUSTEE TO CITIBANK NA. AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE OF SACO I TRUST 2006-12 MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES SERIES 2006-12

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CARA ANTHONY P.

CARA ANTHONY PAUL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/31/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/31/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • Hearing12/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jerry Nyingifa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jerry Nyingifa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jerry Nyingifa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Affina Default Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY, BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARA ANTHONY P.